DESTINE v. CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SEBASTIEN DESTINE
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25 and CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20553
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC.. (SCOTT, RANDOLPH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC..(SCOTT, RANDOLPH)
December 16, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/1/2020. (ams, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 1/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/13/2019. (as, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Central Research, Inc... (SCOTT, RANDOLPH)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDOLPH ANDREW SCOTT on behalf of CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC. (SCOTT, RANDOLPH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Diane Lacorte on 11/27/2019, filed by SEBASTIEN DESTINE. (KAPLAN, BEN)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
November 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC., JOHN DOES 1-25 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10126469) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SEBASTIEN DESTINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAPLAN, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESTINE v. CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL RESEARCH, INC.
Represented By: RANDOLPH ANDREW SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBASTIEN DESTINE
Represented By: BEN A. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?