Super Bread II Corp et al v. Gold Medal Bakery, Inc.
Plaintiff: SUPER BREAD II, CORP and SUPER CAKES CORP.
Defendant: Gold Medal Bakery, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20752
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Order attached to docket entry 7 filed by the Clerk's office on 1/3/2020 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (ams, )
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Compel Gold Medal's compliance with the subpoena is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/3/2020. (ams, )
December 4, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ams, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:19-mc-91471. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #1 Motion to Compel. Gold Medal Bakery having consented to having this motion to quash heard in the jurisdiction of the underlying lawsuit, this motion to compel and cross-motion to quash compliance with is transferred to Judge Waldor in the New Jersey federal court. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Rocha on behalf of Gold Medal Bakery, Inc. (Rocha, William)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Amended Subpoena Filing fee: $ 47, receipt number 0101-7939923 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) and Cross-Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Gold Medal Bakery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Bruce Menken, Esq., #2 Affidavit Certification of William Rocha, Esq, #3 Exhibit Exh. A to Rocha Certification, #4 Exhibit Exh. B to Rocha Certification, #5 Exhibit Exh. C to Rocha Certification, #6 Exhibit Exh. D to Rocha Certification, #7 Exhibit Exh. E to Rocha Certification, #8 Exhibit Exh. F to Rocha Certification, #9 Exhibit Exh. G to Rocha Certification, #10 Exhibit Exh. H to Rocha Certification, #11 Exhibit Exh. I to Rocha Certification, #12 Affidavit Certification of Brian LeComte)(Rocha, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Amended Subpoena Filing fee: $ 47, receipt number 0101-7939923 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) by Super Bread II Corp, Super Bread and Super Cakes Bakery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Order, #6 Exhibit Objections)(Mark, Jenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Super Bread II Corp et al v. Gold Medal Bakery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Medal Bakery, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPER BREAD II, CORP
Represented By: Jenna K. Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPER CAKES CORP.
Represented By: Jenna K. Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?