MCCORMICK v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: MICHAEL T MCCORMICK
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv20903
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd,)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 USMS 285 Form Returned. (jd,)
December 19, 2019 USM-285 and Instructions mailed to Michael T. McCormick. (sm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (sm)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore; the Clerk shall file the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee; the Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and summons upon Defendant with all costs of service advanced by the United States. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/4/2019. (sm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCORMICK v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL T MCCORMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?