CANTWELL v. AURORA PUMP COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JOHN CANTWELL and ROSEMARY CANTWELL
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., VIKING PUMP, INC., GARDNER DENVER, INC., FMC CORPORATION, ELLIOTT COMPANY, THE FALK COMPANY, CRANE CO., THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY, LLC, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, VIAD CORP., ROPER PUMP COMPANY, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATION 51-100 and JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-50
Case Number: 2:2019cv20940
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer no longer assigned to case. (ps, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. PATEL on behalf of GARDNER DENVER, INC. (PATEL, POOJA)
January 22, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. KLUGER on behalf of THE FALK COMPANY (KLUGER, JEFFREY)
January 22, 2020 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (JOHNSON, PAUL)
January 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C. JOHNSON on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC (JOHNSON, PAUL)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK KENNETH-ALLEN ELKINS on behalf of JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (ELKINS, PATRICK)
January 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK KENNETH-ALLEN ELKINS on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY (ELKINS, PATRICK)
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 FMC Corporation ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC CORPORATION.(CALIENDO, ANGELA)
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA COLL CALIENDO on behalf of FMC CORPORATION (CALIENDO, ANGELA)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC identifying Electrolux North America, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC..(STANZIONE, KAREN)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC. identifying Cleaver Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (STANZIONE, KAREN)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN J. STANZIONE on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS, INC. (STANZIONE, KAREN)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AURORA PUMP COMPANY identifying Pentair, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HENRICH, PATRICIA)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA M. HENRICH on behalf of AURORA PUMP COMPANY (HENRICH, PATRICIA)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDY L. HARRIS on behalf of AURORA PUMP COMPANY (HARRIS, BRANDY)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIAD CORP.. (MINETTO, PAMELA)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, CBS CORPORATION, CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., CRANE CO., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC, ELLIOTT COMPANY, FMC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-50, JOHN DOE CORPORATION 51-100, JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., ROPER PUMP COMPANY, THE FALK COMPANY, THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY, LLC, THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, VIKING PUMP, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC by VIAD CORP..(MINETTO, PAMELA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by AMBER ROSE LONG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LONG, AMBER)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. identifying Colfax Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Counsel for Crane Co. shall mail a copy of the notice of removal to Chambers by 12/23/2019. Please tab all exhibits. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2019. (jqb, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 1/30/2020.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2019. (jqb, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ROPER PUMP COMPANY by ROPER PUMP COMPANY.(FIORE, KRISTA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROPER PUMP COMPANY identifying Roper Technologies Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FIORE, KRISTA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA M. HENRICH on behalf of ROPER PUMP COMPANY (HENRICH, PATRICIA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTA FRANKINA FIORE on behalf of ROPER PUMP COMPANY (FIORE, KRISTA)
December 4, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRANE CO. from Middlesex, case number 07271-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10148994), filed by CRANE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Dale J. Friemoth, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of David P. Sargent, #4 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit A 1 of 6, #5 Exhibit Sargent Aff -Exhibit A 2 of 6, #6 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit A 3 of 6, #7 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit A 4 of 6, #8 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit A 5 of 6, #9 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit A 6 of 6, #10 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit G-1, #16 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit G-2, #17 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit G-3, #18 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit G-4, #19 Exhibit Sargent Aff - Exhibit H, #20 Exhibit Affidavit of Samuel A. Forman, #21 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. A, #22 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 1, #23 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 2, #24 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 3, #25 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 4, #26 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 5_Part1, #27 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 5_Part2, #28 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 5_Part3, #29 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 5_Part4, #30 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 5_Part5, #31 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 5_Part6, #32 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 6, #33 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 7, #34 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 8, #35 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 9, #36 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 10, #37 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 11, #38 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 12, #39 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 13, #40 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 14, #41 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 15, #42 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 16, #43 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 17, #44 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 18, #45 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 19, #46 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 20, #47 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 21, #48 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 22_Part1, #49 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 22_Part2, #50 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 22_Part3, #51 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 22_Part4, #52 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 23, #53 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 24_Part1, #54 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 24_Part2, #55 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 24_Part3, #56 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 24_Part4, #57 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 25, #58 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 26, #59 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 27, #60 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 28, #61 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 29, #62 Exhibit Forman aff Ex. 30, #63 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Middlesex Court, #64 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #65 Certification, #66 Certificate of Service)(PASCARELLA, LISA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANTWELL v. AURORA PUMP COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK KENNETH-ALLEN ELKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: POOJA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT COMPANY
Represented By: PATRICK KENNETH-ALLEN ELKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FALK COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE J.R. CLARKSON COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: BRANDY L. HARRIS
Represented By: PATRICIA M. HENRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: PAUL C. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP.
Represented By: PAMELA JOAN MINETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROPER PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: KRISTA FRANKINA FIORE
Represented By: PATRICIA M. HENRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: KAREN J. STANZIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION 51-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CANTWELL
Represented By: AMBER ROSE LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARY CANTWELL
Represented By: AMBER ROSE LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?