VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC v. IANCU et al
Plaintiff: VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, ANDREI IANCU, in his official capacity as Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office and ANDREI IANCU
Case Number: 2:2019cv20948
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Rosini to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COHEN-NOWAK, JESSICA)
January 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee sa to James E. Rosini: $ 150, receipt number TRE109164 (mg)
January 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES E ROSINI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (qa, )
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JAMES E. ROSINI, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/16/2020. (dam, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to admit James E. Rosini, Esq. - Certification of James E. Rosini (re-submitted with scanned signature) (COHEN-NOWAK, JESSICA)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to admit James E. Rosini, Esq. by VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jessica Cohen-Nowak, #2 Certification of James E. Rosini, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN-NOWAK, JESSICA)
January 14, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of James E. Rosini (attached to #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac) submitted by JESSICA COHEN-NOWAK on 1/14/2020 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
January 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to admit James E. Rosini, Esq.. Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC. THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE served on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued by the Clerk of the Court)(COHEN-NOWAK, JESSICA)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC. ANDREI IANCU served on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued by the Clerk of the Court)(COHEN-NOWAK, JESSICA)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX HANNA on behalf of All Defendants (HANNA, ALEX)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANDREI IANCU, THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY SCOTT BOCZKO on behalf of VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC (BOCZKO, JEREMY)
December 3, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC identifying Vitamin Shoppe, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN-NOWAK, JESSICA)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREI IANCU, in his official capacity as Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10149289), filed by VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(COHEN-NOWAK, JESSICA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC v. IANCU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VITAMIN SHOPPE PROCUREMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JESSICA ANN COHEN-NOWAK
Represented By: JEREMY SCOTT BOCZKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Represented By: ALEX HANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREI IANCU, in his official capacity as Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREI IANCU
Represented By: ALEX HANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?