CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM v. TILLERSON et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM
Defendant: JACK P. WILLIAMS, MICHAEL J. DOLAN, REX W. TILLERSON, DARREN W. WOODS, DONALD D. HUMPHREYS, ANDREW P. SWIGER, MARK W. ALBERS and EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv20949
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK W. ALBERS, MICHAEL J. DOLAN, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, DONALD D. HUMPHREYS, ANDREW P. SWIGER, REX W. TILLERSON, JACK P. WILLIAMS, DARREN W. WOODS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
December 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GEOFFREY M. JOHNSON and SCOTT R. JACOBSEN, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Scott R. Jacobsen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10170195.) (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Geoffrey M. Johnson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10170133.) (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott R. Jacobsen, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/10/19. (jc, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Geoffrey M. Johnson, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/10/19. (jc, )
December 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Scott R. Jacobsen, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Geoffrey M. Johnson. Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Scott R. Jacobsen by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jonathan M. Zimmerman in Support, #2 Certification of Scott R. Jacobsen in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Geoffrey M. Johnson by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jonathan M. Zimmerman in Support, #2 Certification of Geoffrey M. Johnson in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 4, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (ps, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to DARREN W. WOODS. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to JACK P. WILLIAMS. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to REX W. TILLERSON. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to ANDREW P. SWIGER. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to DONALD D. HUMPHREYS. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to MICHAEL J. DOLAN. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM as to MARK W. ALBERS. (ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK W. ALBERS, MICHAEL J. DOLAN, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, DONALD D. HUMPHREYS, ANDREW P. SWIGER, REX W. TILLERSON, JACK P. WILLIAMS, DARREN W. WOODS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10149290) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ZIMMERMAN, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM v. TILLERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK P. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. DOLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REX W. TILLERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARREN W. WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD D. HUMPHREYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW P. SWIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK W. ALBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM
Represented By: JONATHAN MICHAEL ZIMMERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?