FIGUEROA v. CITY OF JERSEY CITY et al
Plaintiff: FLORENCIO FIGUEROA
Defendant: LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., ABC ENTITIES 1-5, FORMER POLICE CHIEF PHILIP D. ZACCHE, in his official and individual capacities, CITY OF JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA, in his official and individual capacities, JOHN DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified detectives, officers, employees or representatives of any law enforcement agency or public entity including the CITY OF JERSEY CITY having any law enforcement duties, ESTHER PIERRE, WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ, in his official and individual capacities, WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER FRITZ-GIL, in his official and individual capacities, OFFICER LARIOS in his official and individual capacities, JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAM DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified officers, employees, agents, representatives, internal affairs officials from the JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT/CITY OF JERSEY CITY, charged with supervision, trainin, POLICE CHIEF MICHAEL KELLY, in his official and individual capacities, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, OFFICER JOSUE MARTINEZ, in his official and individual capacities, JANE DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified medical responders, EMTS, BLS, paramedics, or law enforcement officers charged with providing medical care to FLORENCIO FIGUEROA), MARY DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified employees or agents of the group home operated by JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER), SANDY MAZYCK, FORMER POLICE CHIEF PHILIP D. ZACCHE, POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA, POLICE CHIEF MICHAEL KELLY, OFFICER JOSUE MARTINEZ, MARY DOES 1-5, SAM DOES 1-5, JOHN DOES 1-5, WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ, OFFICER LARIOS and JANE DOES 1-5
Case Number: 2:2019cv20993
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 City of Jersey City's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , ANSWER to Crossclaim of JCMC, CROSSCLAIM against JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., SANDY MAZYCK, ESTHER PIERRE by WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, SAM DOES 1-5, MICHAEL KELLY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, JOSUE MARTINEZ, PHILIP D. ZACCHE, LARIOS, POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA.(MURRAY, BRITTANY)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Jersey City Medical Center, Liberty Healthcare System, Inc., Sandy Mazyck, and Ester Pierre ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Separate Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against CITY OF JERSEY CITY by JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER.(ROSENBERG, SAM)
January 10, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Letter Local Civ. R. 6.1 Extending Time to Answer submitted by CITY OF JERSEY CITY, MICHAEL KELLY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/27/2020. (ams, )
January 10, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future requests similar to #5 Letter, please use the event Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order found under Other Documents (ams, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Jersey City Local Civ. R. 6.1 Extending Time to Answer. (MURRAY, BRITTANY)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FLORENCIO FIGUEROA. CITY OF JERSEY CITY served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; CITY OF JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; MICHAEL KELLY served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; LARIOS served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020; JOSUE MARTINEZ served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; SANDY MAZYCK served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; ESTHER PIERRE served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020; POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020; WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 PROOF OF SERVICE - CITY OF JERSEY CITY, #2 PROOF OF SERVICE - CITY OF JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, #3 PROOF OF SERVICE - POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA, #4 PROOF OF SERVICE - POLICE CHIEF MICHAEL KELLY, #5 PROOF OF SERVICE - WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ, #6 PROOF OF SERVICE - OFFICER JOSUE MARTINEZ, #7 PROOF OF SERVICE - OFFICER LARIOS, #8 PROOF OF SERVICE - JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, #9 PROOF OF SERVICE - LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., #10 PROOF OF SERVICE - SANDY MAZYCK, #11 PROOF OF SERVICE - ESTHER PIERRE)(STANGLER, SHELLEY)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITY OF JERSEY CITY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, MICHAEL KELLY, LARIOS, LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., JOSUE MARTINEZ, SANDY MAZYCK, ESTHER PIERRE, POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA, WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ, PHILIP D. ZACCHE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
December 3, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (ps, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLORENCIO FIGUEROA. (STANGLER, SHELLEY)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10152532) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FLORENCIO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(STANGLER, SHELLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIGUEROA v. CITY OF JERSEY CITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORMER POLICE CHIEF PHILIP D. ZACCHE, in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA, in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified detectives, officers, employees or representatives of any law enforcement agency or public entity including the CITY OF JERSEY CITY having any law enforcement duties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTHER PIERRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ, in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER FRITZ-GIL, in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER LARIOS in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: SAM ROSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified officers, employees, agents, representatives, internal affairs officials from the JERSEY CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT/CITY OF JERSEY CITY, charged with supervision, trainin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE CHIEF MICHAEL KELLY, in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF JERSEY CITY
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOSUE MARTINEZ, in his official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified medical responders, EMTS, BLS, paramedics, or law enforcement officers charged with providing medical care to FLORENCIO FIGUEROA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY DOES 1-5 (as yet unidentified employees or agents of the group home operated by JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDY MAZYCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORMER POLICE CHIEF PHILIP D. ZACCHE
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE PUBLIC SAFETY DIRECTOR JAMES SHEA
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE CHIEF MICHAEL KELLY
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOSUE MARTINEZ
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM DOES 1-5
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST PATROL UNIT OFFICER RUBEN MUNOZ
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER LARIOS
Represented By: BRITTANY MURRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORENCIO FIGUEROA
Represented By: SHELLEY LYNN STANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?