SODEINDE v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: BUKOLA SODEINDE
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv21159
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Robert Salaman to schedule initial conference. (SALAMAN, ROBERT)
January 21, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter filed by Robert D. Salaman on 1/20/20 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT using Letter. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery to schedule initial conference by BUKOLA SODEINDE. (SALAMAN, ROBERT)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(DESMEDT, EMILY)
December 18, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/15/20. (jc, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KATIMS, TOVA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY C. DESMEDT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD G. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TOVA KATIMS on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. (KATIMS, TOVA)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
December 6, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (ps, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10164140) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BUKOLA SODEINDE. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SALAMAN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SODEINDE v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUKOLA SODEINDE
Represented By: ROBERT D. SALAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD G. ROSENBLATT
Represented By: EMILY C. DESMEDT
Represented By: TOVA KATIMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?