BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION
Defendant: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv21618
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer no longer assigned to case. (ps, )
January 28, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/18/2020. (qa, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant. Attorney PHILIP C. SILVERBERG for ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY added. (SILVERBERG, PHILIP)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION. (BREENE, PAUL)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY B. CRAWFORD on behalf of BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION (CRAWFORD, ANTHONY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
December 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION. (BREENE, PAUL)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10193173) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ace Policy)(BREENE, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PHILIP C. SILVERBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSHORE RECYCLING CORPORATION
Represented By: PAUL EVAN BREENE
Represented By: ANTHONY B. CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?