MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG v. COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD.
Plaintiff: MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG
Defendant: COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD.
Case Number: 2:2019cv21634
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG. COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD. waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (KRAUZLIS, JAMES)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
December 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG as to COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD.. (KRAUZLIS, JAMES)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (KRAUZLIS, JAMES)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10194356), filed by MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KRAUZLIS, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG v. COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSCO SHIPPING LINES CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUND & FESTER GMBH & CO. KG
Represented By: JAMES PAUL KRAUZLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?