ALLERGAN SALES, LLC et al v. TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: ALLERGAN USA, INC., ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S. and FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMA INC. and TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2019cv21709
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Update - The #12 Letter Request has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/18/20. (jc, )
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendant Torrent Pharmaceuticals' Letter Request for an extension of time to February 18, 2020 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint. Rule 16 Conference set for March 24, 2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/3/20. (jc, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Steven C. Mannion, U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time for Torrent to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 13, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TORRENT PHARMA INC., TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/4/20. (jc, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of TORRENT PHARMA INC., TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of TORRENT PHARMA INC., TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS on behalf of ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED, PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S. (ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS, ZAHIRE)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED, PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S. (RUIZ, HECTOR)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachments) (jc, )
December 20, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard #5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed by the Clerk's office on 12/20/19. The patent cover sheet was not included. (jc, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (jc, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TORRENT PHARMA INC., TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
December 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S.. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED. (WALSH, LIZA)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TORRENT PHARMA INC., TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10196820), filed by PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S., ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 AO 120 Form)(WALSH, LIZA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLERGAN SALES, LLC et al v. TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLERGAN USA, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLERGAN SALES, LLC
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: ZAHIRE DESIREE ESTRELLA-CHAMBERS
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMA INC.
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?