AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Plaintiff: JORGE M FERNANDEZ, JR., FRANCIS CARBONNEAU, MARK JOHNSTON, HECTOR J. VALDES, JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA, Johanna Mayer, BRIAN D GRAIFMAN, Daniela Goyer, VICKI JOHNS, Caleb Dirrim, MARY BOWERS, Wendy Wallach, JANE DOE, ELIZABETH HOLLWAY, DENISE BROWN-WELLS, Ashley Jilek, Amanda Hayhurst, KATHY NEAL, Peter D. Smith, Karina Gras, Mary Beth Kerns, JOHN CARROLL, MOHAMAD MOHAMAD, Kaesha Gaye Camilia Henry, PATRICK ROGGE, Misty Marler, ERIN THERESA GRAY, JENNIFER RABEN, MARK WOODS, HANNAH WEISS, NOEL BENADOM, Joanna Eggins, Ritzie Key, David Finch, Emily Smith, Edgar Gutierrez, Paula Worthey, Jeffrey Grossman, NAOMI SHAPIRO, LaTorrie Glover-Brown, Daniel Ryan, Matthew Webb, BRIAN LEVY, CLYDE FREEMAN, TATYANA SHULMAN, TIFFANY DUONG, LORI WEINRIB, ERICKSON J OCASIO, ZAKARIA HAQUE, Sean DeMarco, Douglas Dermody, SCARLETTE JONES, Satoria Monlyn, Donnetta Huffman, ROBERT OSWALD, Melissa Ryan, STEPHEN ROSENTHAL, DEANNA RAHILL, TIM COLLINSWORTH, Gina Allende, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal, Brandon Laughlin, Michael DeMarshall, GABRIEL MOLINA, MARK MEISEL, ROBERT CORWIN, Eric Cinelli, GENE HIVELY, Ashley Finch, PERNELL THOMAS, CHERYL CHUHA, CINDY FARBER, Emory Grauberger, Morgan Ottmann, Glenn French, Rosa Villarreal, Brian Lanouette, L.D., NAOMI JAWOROWSKI, RIA JAIRAM, KIMMIE MARTIN, SHERRIE PALMER, DARLANE SARACINA, MOISES PEREZ, JOHN BRILEY, LATEASE RIKARD, CAMERON SPENCER, ROSARIA GLADERO, DEBRA WRENN, DANIEL DAVIS, LORI LAMONDIE-MURPHY, SUSAN DUCKWORTH, ISAAC WILLIAMS-WINTERS, SHANE DRAGOO, JOYCE ROSSELLI, JUSTIN NELSON-CARTER, VALERIE SCOTT, EDITH THROWER, CAROLYN GREEN, Kelley Whalen, PAMELA DRISKELL, ELLA GULLY, BRITTNEY PETTITA, DEANNA TAYLOR, CAROL KAPLAN, GARY SCHWALL, DEBBIE AMICO, NANCY INFIELD, BRENDA EVANS, MELANIE VAZQUEZ, KIM PARROTT, TANYA HARRIS, MICHAEL RUTAN, LUCINDA DIRKS, LEO GALLAGHER-KOWIT, MEGAN STOREY, ANNIE MAE SMITH, JENNIFER HALEY, ALEXANDR NAZEMINIKOV, TONDA TATE, JESSE LEBON, GWENDOLYN ANDERSON, CASSANDRA JERRY, SHEERA HARRIS, ROSE MARIE PERRY, JO ANN BUCK, MARTHA CUVILLIER, HOLLY LAUFENBERG, JEFFREY GRUSHKA, JOANN APONTE, TRACY BUHR, CYNTHIA CONNOR, WILLIAM INFIELD, ELIZABETH HOLLOWAY, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, SHANNON WALDEN, KERRY STEED, GEORGE ROTHWELL, SANDRA LASSITER, CATLIN STANFORD, TODD STONE, TIFFANY GOINS, WILLIAM LINDSAY, ANN DAVIS, KARLI PARKER, TIMOTHY PETRI, KRISTOPHER THOMAS and BRIAN D. GRAIFMAN
Defendant: OPTUM360, LLC, QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, BIO-REFERENCE LABORATORIES, INC., Inform Diagnostics Inc., CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC., QUEST DIAGNOSTICS CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC., UNITED HEALTH GROUP, OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, CARECENTRIX, INC., SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, CBL PATH, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD and RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC. d/b/a American Medical Collection Agency
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019md02904
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 236 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal As to Certain Plaintiffs by Michael DeMarshall, ERIN THERESA GRAY, Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Amanda Hayhurst, Kaesha Gaye Camilia Henry, Donnetta Huffman, MOHAMAD MOHAMAD, Rosa Villarreal (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference set for September 2, 2020 is adjourned to October 29, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/18/2020. (TAD)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #233 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kate Heinzelman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/2020. (ams, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 233 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kate Heinzelman (admitted Pro Hac Vice) by QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
July 29, 2020 Filing 232 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FRANCIS CARBONNEAU, ROBERT CORWIN, Eric Cinelli, Sean DeMarco, Michael DeMarshall, Douglas Dermody, Joanna Eggins, CINDY FARBER, JORGE M FERNANDEZ, JR., Glenn French, ERIN THERESA GRAY, Daniela Goyer, ZAKARIA HAQUE, Kaesha Gaye Camilia Henry, VICKI JOHNS, MARK JOHNSTON(Plaintiff in 19-13957), Ritzie Key, BRIAN LEVY, Brian Lanouette, MARK MEISEL, Misty Marler, Johanna Mayer, Satoria Monlyn, ROBERT OSWALD(Plaintiff in 19-17036), Morgan Ottmann, JENNIFER RABEN, DEANNA RAHILL, PATRICK ROGGE, Daniel Ryan, Melissa Ryan, NAOMI SHAPIRO, Emily Smith, Peter D. Smith, HECTOR J. VALDES, LORI WEINRIB, HANNAH WEISS, MARK WOODS, Paula Worthey (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JON P. KARDASSAKIS and MICHAEL K. GRIMALDI, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 230 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA. (NEMATZADEH, JUSTIN)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 TEXT ORDER: There being no discovery issues ripe for the Court's consideration at this time, the telephone conference scheduled for Monday, July 27, 2020 is adjourned to September 2, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall join the call by dialing 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/24/2020. (TAD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 228 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Inform Diagnostics Inc. re #213 MOTION to Dismiss (SHAPIRO, PETER)
July 21, 2020 Filing 231 Transcript of Recorded Opinion held on July 16, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 8/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2020. (wh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 227 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report For July 27, 2020 Conference by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' application to compel Defendants to produce documents concerning any cybersecurity incidents and breaches of Defendants' or their vendors' systems for 2010 through August 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/16/2020. (jqb, )
July 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Opinion held on 7/16/2020 re Plaintiffs' application to compel Defendants to produce documents concerning any cybersecurity incidents and breaches of Defendants' or their vendors' systems for 2010 through August 2018.(ECR) (jqb, )
July 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Michael D. Murphy. Receipt number TRE112624 (jdb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 225 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PERNELL THOMAS re #213 MOTION to Dismiss (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
July 8, 2020 Filing 224 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael K. Grimaldi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11045335.) (SHAPIRO, PETER)
July 8, 2020 Filing 223 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jon P. Kardassakis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11044703.) (SHAPIRO, PETER)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #207 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michaek K. Grimaldi and #208 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jon P. Kardassakis, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/30/20. (jc, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 221 NOTICE of Change of Address by MELISSA R. EMERT (EMERT, MELISSA)
June 24, 2020 Filing 220 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES)
June 22, 2020 Filing 219 Transcript of Hearing held on June 10, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 7/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020. (wh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 218 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CARECENTRIX, INC. re #176 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DAVIS, LANE)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting the Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael D. Murphy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/15/2020. (ams, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 216 DECLARATION of James E. Cecchi and Michael D. Murphy re #211 Letter (Corrected) by MOISES PEREZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Murphy (Corrected))(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER re Discovery Disputes, etc.; Telephone Status Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/11/2020. (ams, )
June 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/10/2020. (ECR) (jqb, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 214 Exhibit to #213 Motion to Dismiss, Exhibits C and D to David Ulrich Declaration by Inform Diagnostics Inc.. (SHAPIRO, PETER)
June 10, 2020 Filing 213 MOTION to Dismiss by Inform Diagnostics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Summer Krywucki, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of David Ulrich, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(SHAPIRO, PETER)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 TEXT ORDER: NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE ONLY --- Due to the Court's scheduling conflicts, the conference scheduled for 2:00 today shall take place instead at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/10/2020. (Hammer, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 211 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Declaration of Michael D. Murphy, #3 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Michael D. Murphy Pro Hac Vice)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 9, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Response #209 and #210 filed by David Cooner on 6/9/2020 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jqb, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 210 REPLY to Response re #205 Response (NOT Motion),,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2019.11.04 (D.N.J. 94) Joint Discovery Plan)(COONER, DAVID) Modified on 6/9/2020 (jqb, ).
June 9, 2020 Filing 209 RESPONSE re #205 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2019.11.04 (D.N.J. 94) Joint Discovery Plan)(COONER, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 2, 2020 Filing 208 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jon P. Kardassakis by Inform Diagnostics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter T. Shapiro in Support, #2 Declaration of Jon Kardassakis in Support, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SHAPIRO, PETER)
June 2, 2020 Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael K. Grimaldi by Inform Diagnostics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter T. Shapiro in support, #2 Declaration of Michael K. Grimaldi in support, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SHAPIRO, PETER)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference set for 6/4/2020 is adjourned and converted to a Telephone Status Conference on 6/10/2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Please dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/2/2020. (jqb, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 205 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Discovery Issues. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) Modified on 6/11/2020 (jqb, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 204 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED re #150 MOTION to Dismiss (HOFFMAN, DAVID)
May 26, 2020 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by OPTUM360, LLC re #149 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Quest & Optum 360 (SELIGMANN, READE)
May 26, 2020 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, CBL PATH, CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
May 26, 2020 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA re #146 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (COONER, DAVID)
May 21, 2020 Filing 200 BRIEF Response Brief in Support of Discovery Regarding Defendants' Other Cybersecurity Incidents (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 21, 2020 Filing 199 BRIEF /Defendants' Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Discovery of Other Cybersecurity Incidents (SELIGMANN, READE)
May 18, 2020 Filing 198 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DEBBIE AMICO, BRIAN D GRAIFMAN, L.D. re #176 MOTION to Dismiss (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
May 14, 2020 Filing 197 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding ESI Protocol by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(CECCHI, JAMES)
May 11, 2020 Filing 196 Transcript of Videoconference Hearing held on April 23, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2020. (wh)
May 11, 2020 Filing 195 Defendant's Response Brief by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA. (COONER, DAVID)
May 11, 2020 Filing 194 BRIEF in Support of Discovery Regarding Defendants' Other Cybersecurity Incidents (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/23/2020. (ECR) (jqb, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 193 AMENDED COMPLAINT (CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT) against Inform Diagnostics Inc., filed by PERNELL THOMAS.(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
April 23, 2020 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE ANNE KISLOFF on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA (KISLOFF, MICHELLE)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/22/20. (jc, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 190 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES by PERNELL THOMAS. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 TEXT ORDER: The conference scheduled for April 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. shall proceed as a telephone conference. Counsel shall use the following dial-in information: Dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/17/2020. (TAD)
April 15, 2020 Filing 188 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report for April 23, 2020 Conference by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to file a status report regarding the need for the status conference currently scheduled for April 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. by the close of business on April 15, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/13/2020. (TAD)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL of all claims against defendant, BioReference without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fee and costs. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/9/20. (gh, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 185 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by NOEL BENADOM, DEANNA RAHILL. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
April 6, 2020 Filing 184 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kate E. Heinzelman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 183 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Margeaux R. Azar to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 3, 2020 Filing 182 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Franklin D. Azar to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee Received: $ 150, receipt number TRE110571 as to Michael T. Hensley, Esq. (jjc, )
April 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee Received: $ 300, receipt number TRE110461 as to Margeaux R. Azar and Franklin D. Azar (jjc, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #180 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Franklin D. Azar and Margeaux R. Azar, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/23/20. (jc, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 180 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Franklin D. Azar and Margeaux R. Azar by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James E. Cecchi, #2 Declaration of Franklin D. Azar, #3 Declaration of Margeaux R. Azar)(CECCHI, JAMES)
March 16, 2020 Filing 179 Transcript of Teleconference held on March 12, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (wh) (Main Document 179 replaced on 3/17/2020) (wh, ).
March 16, 2020 Filing 178 Exhibit to #176 Motion to Dismiss,, Signature Page to Attachment to Notice of Motion by CARECENTRIX, INC.. (DAVIS, LANE)
March 16, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE by JENNIFER RABEN of Withdrawal of Ivy T. Ngo as Counsel of Record (NGO, IVY)
March 16, 2020 Filing 176 MOTION to Dismiss by CARECENTRIX, INC.. Responses due by 5/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Lane W. Davis, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Davis, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Davis, #5 Affidavit Jason Halstead in Support of Jurisdictional Rule 12(b)(1) Motion, #6 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Halstead, #7 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Halstead, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and to Strike, #9 Certificate of Service)(DAVIS, LANE)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order on the ESI protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/12/2020. (jqb, )
March 12, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument on the ESI protocol dispute held on 3/12/2020. Order to follow. (ECR) (jqb, ) Modified on 3/12/2020 (jqb, ).
March 12, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AYERS, CHRISTOPHER)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #172 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kate E. Heinzelman, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/11/2020. (ams, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 172 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kate E. Heinzelman) by QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael Hensley in support of K. Heinzelman pro hac vice, #2 Certification of K. Heinzelman)(HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 TEXT ORDER: The in-person conference set for 3/12/2020 shall proceed via telephone. Please dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference call at 1:55 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/2020. (jqb, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 170 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding March 12, 2020 Conference re 169 Order. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 TEXT ORDER: By 5 p.m. today, the parties shall confer with each other and inform the Court on whether they wish to proceed with Thursday's conference telephonically. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/2020. (jqb, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 168 BRIEF in Opposition filed by GWENDOLYN ANDERSON, TIM COLLINSWORTH(Plaintiff in 19-16981), DANIEL DAVIS, TONDA TATE re #147 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
March 9, 2020 Filing 167 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #148 MOTION to Dismiss , #146 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 9, 2020 Filing 166 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #150 MOTION to Dismiss , #149 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Quest & Optum 360 (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 9, 2020 Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Class Action Complaint by PERNELL THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
March 5, 2020 Filing 164 STATUS REPORT For March 12, 2020 Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 2, 2020 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON TODD DENNETT on behalf of NOEL BENADOM, TATYANA SHULMAN(Plaintiff in 19-16575) (DENNETT, JASON)
February 26, 2020 Filing 162 STATEMENT Defendants' Response in Support of Their Proposed ESI Protocol [DE 159] by OPTUM360, LLC. (SELIGMANN, READE)
February 26, 2020 Filing 161 BRIEF Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Proposed ESI Protocol (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 21, 2020 Filing 160 BRIEF in Support of Plaintiffs' ESI Protocol (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Joint ESI Protocol, #2 Exhibit B - Pretrial Order No. 18, #3 Exhibit C - Pretrial Order No. 105, #4 Exhibit D - Douglas Forrest Declaration)(CECCHI, JAMES)
February 21, 2020 Filing 159 STATEMENT /Defendants' Statement in Support of Proposed Discovery Protocol by OPTUM360, LLC. (SELIGMANN, READE)
February 21, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of MARK JOHNSTON(Plaintiff in 19-13957), SCARLETTE JONES, BRIAN LEVY, NAOMI SHAPIRO, JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA, HANNAH WEISS (MAKHAIL, MARK)
February 20, 2020 Filing 157 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding ESI Protocol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
February 13, 2020 Filing 156 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth C. Lockwood to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FANNING, EDWARD)
February 11, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW041964 as to Elizabeth C. Lockwood, Esq. (ams, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ELIZABETH C. LOCKWOOD, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/31/2020. (dam, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Elizabeth C. Lockwood) by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward J. Fanning, Jr., #2 Declaration of Elizabeth C. Lockwood, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FANNING, EDWARD)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 TEXT ORDER: The parties' request to adjourn the conference scheduled for tomorrow, January 30, 2020, is granted. The March 12, 2020 conference shall proceed as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/29/2020. (TAD)
January 27, 2020 Filing 152 Letter from the Parties to M.J. Hammer regarding adjournment of status conference. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
January 24, 2020 Filing 151 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report For January 30, 2020 Conference by All Plaintiffs. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 23, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DONALD M. HOUSER and KRISTINE MCALISTER BROWN, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 150 MOTION to Dismiss by QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HOFFMAN, DAVID)
January 22, 2020 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Quest & Optum 360 by OPTUM360, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Certification of Reade W. Seligmann, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SELIGMANN, READE)
January 22, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Appendix A, #6 Appendix B, #7 Appendix C, #8 Appendix D, #9 Appendix E, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(COONER, DAVID)
January 22, 2020 Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, CBL PATH, CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Spiegel in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #4 Certificate of Service)(SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
January 22, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COONER, DAVID)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Defendants' Letter requesting a one week adjournment to file their motions to dismiss the consolidated complaints. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/13/2020. (dam, )
January 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter Application for Extension of Time #144 filed by Mr. Spiegel on 1/13/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. Please remember to use the Letter or Application event. (jqb, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Dismiss by AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, CBL PATH, LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD. (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
January 10, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by JORKEELL ECHEVERRIA on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED (ECHEVERRIA, JORKEELL)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendants' and Plaintiffs' January 8, 2020 letters [D.E. 135, 137]. The Defendants' request to file over-length briefs is granted in part, as follows: Any brief in support of the motion shall not exceed 60 double-spaced pages. Any opposition brief shall not exceed 60 double-spaced pages. Any reply brief shall not exceed 20 double-spaced pages. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/2020. (MAH)
January 10, 2020 Filing 140 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kristine McAlister Brown to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10240288.) (SELIGMANN, READE)
January 10, 2020 Filing 139 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Donald M. Houser to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10240246.) (SELIGMANN, READE)
January 9, 2020 Filing 142 Transcript of Status Conference held on October 1, 2019, before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Court Reporter: Charles McGuire (215-840-7030). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 1/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2020. (mfr)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #134 Plaintiff's Letter regarding the Consolidated Amended Complaint and the forthcoming Motion to Dismiss. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/7/202. (dam, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 137 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Motion To Dismiss Briefing re #135 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Mariott Case Management Order, #2 Anthem Case Management Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 8, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD A. ECKLUND on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ECKLUND, DONALD)
January 8, 2020 Filing 135 Letter from Michael T. Hensley. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2020 Filing 134 Letter from Plaintiffs Regarding the Consolidated Amended Complaint and Schedule for CareCentrix Inc.'s Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 2, 2020 Filing 133 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CARECENTRIX, INC., filed by L.D., DEBBIE AMICO, BRIAN D. GRAIFMAN.(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 2, 2020 Filing 132 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Cooke to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COONER, DAVID)
December 27, 2019 Filing 131 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DANIEL DAVIS, GWENDOLYN ANDERSON, TONDA TATE, TIM COLLINSWORTH, TIM COLLINSWORTH(Plaintiff in 19-16981). SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
December 23, 2019 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DANIEL DAVIS, GWENDOLYN ANDERSON, TONDA TATE, TIM COLLINSWORTH, TIM COLLINSWORTH(Plaintiff in 19-16981). LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
December 23, 2019 Filing 129 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DANIEL DAVIS, GWENDOLYN ANDERSON, TONDA TATE, TIM COLLINSWORTH, TIM COLLINSWORTH(Plaintiff in 19-16981). AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
December 19, 2019 Filing 128 Transcript of Hearing held on December 13, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 1/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2020. (bt, )
December 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to ADAM A. COOKE, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW041352 (dam, )
December 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument held on 12/13/2019 re #114 Defendants' application/motion to stay discovery. (ECR) (jqb, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying #114 Defendants' Application to stay discovery and setting next status conference. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2019. (dam, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE by Inform Diagnostics Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance (CAMPION, GRADY)
December 13, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE by Inform Diagnostics Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance (LOPEZ, EVELYN)
December 13, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE by Inform Diagnostics Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance (MCGINTY, KEVIN)
December 13, 2019 Remark: The Court has set up a conference call for today's conference. Please dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference call at 10:55 a.m. To mute the call, please dial *6. (jqb, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU on behalf of AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, CBL PATH, CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD (PANAGOPOULOU, ARIADNE)
December 12, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO on behalf of AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, CBL PATH, CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD (BARTOLOMEO, BRADLEY)
December 12, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY SPIEGEL on behalf of AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, CBL PATH, CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD (SPIEGEL, JEFFREY)
December 5, 2019 Filing 120 BRIEF In Opposition To Stay of Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ADAM A. COOKE, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/5/2019. (dam, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Adam A. Cooke, Esq.) by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward J. Fanning, Jr., Esq., #2 Declaration of Adam A. Cooke, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FANNING, EDWARD)
December 2, 2019 Filing 117 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, CBL PATH, CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (See Amended Complaint D.E. #107 ). (sms)
December 2, 2019 Filing 116 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CARECENTRIX, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (Re: Amended Complaint #106 ). (sms)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MDL ORDER modifying Paragraph 2 of Case Management Order #2; all other provisions of Case Management Order #2 shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/22/19. (gh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 114 Letter from Reade W. Seligmann re: Defendants' Application for Stay of Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SELIGMANN, READE) Modified on 12/18/2019 (jqb, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Change of Address by ROSEMARY M. RIVAS (RIVAS, ROSEMARY)
November 25, 2019 Filing 112 Request for Summons to be Issued by DEANNA RAHILL, NOEL BENADOM(Plaintiff in 19-14037) as to All Defendants. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO on behalf of Inform Diagnostics Inc. (SHAPIRO, PETER)
November 22, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY L. RUSSELL on behalf of GINA ALLENDE, TRACY BUHR, MARTHA CUVILLIER, SUSAN DUCKWORTH, BRENDA EVANS, David Finch, ROSARIA GLADERO, TIFFANY GOINS, JENNIFER HALEY, SHEERA HARRIS, TANYA HARRIS, CASSANDRA JERRY, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, CAROL KAPLAN, LORI LAMONDIE-MURPHY, SANDRA LASSITER, HOLLY LAUFENBERG, JESSE LEBON, ALEXANDR NAZEMINIKOV, JUSTIN NELSON-CARTER, SHERRIE PALMER, TIMOTHY PETRI, GEORGE ROTHWELL, VALERIE SCOTT, TATYANA SHULMAN(Plaintiff in 19-16575), CAMERON SPENCER, KRISTOPHER THOMAS, EDITH THROWER, MELANIE VAZQUEZ, ISAAC WILLIAMS-WINTERS, DEBRA WRENN, Wendy Wallach(Plaintiff in 19-16711) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(RUSSELL, MARY)
November 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/20/2019 with counsel in the New Jersey and New York State Court Actions regarding coordination with the Multi-District Litigation pursuant to #108 and #109 . (No Court Reporter/Recorder) (jqb, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 109 Letter from Bradley J. Bartolomeo to Judge Michael A. Hammer re coordination with state court matter. (BARTOLOMEO, BRADLEY)
November 18, 2019 Filing 108 Letter from Quest Diagnostics Incorporated re: coordination of State Court Action with MDL. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
November 15, 2019 Filing 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC., SONIC HEALTHCARE USA, AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES, SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES, CBL PATH, AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC, LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD, SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC, PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC, SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC., ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY, WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD, LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC, AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES, filed by TIM COLLINSWORTH, TONDA TATE, GWENDOLYN ANDERSON, DANIEL DAVIS.(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 15, 2019 Filing 106 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against CARECENTRIX, INC., DEBBIE AMICO, L.D., filed by DEBBIE AMICO, L.D..(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 15, 2019 Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, filed by EDITH THROWER, TIFFANY GOINS, JENNIFER HALEY, SUSAN DUCKWORTH, DEBRA WRENN, SHERRIE PALMER, LORI LAMONDIE-MURPHY, KRISTOPHER THOMAS, VALERIE SCOTT, GEORGE ROTHWELL, HOLLY LAUFENBERG, BRENDA EVANS, CASSANDRA JERRY, MELANIE VAZQUEZ, CAMERON SPENCER, ISAAC WILLIAMS-WINTERS, JESSE LEBON, TRACY BUHR, SHEERA HARRIS, WENDY WALLACH, MARTHA CUVILLIER, SANDRA LASSITER, TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN, David Finch, JUSTIN NELSON-CARTER, ROSARIA GLADERO, GINA ALLENDE, TATYANA SHULMAN, CAROL KAPLAN, TANYA HARRIS, ALEXANDR NAZEMINIKOV, TIMOTHY PETRI.(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 15, 2019 Filing 104 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against OPTUM360, LLC, QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED, ANN DAVIS, Ashley Finch, NANCY INFIELD, DARLANE SARACINA, ELLA GULLY, DEANNA TAYLOR, JOHN BRILEY, ROSE MARIE PERRY, MICHAEL RUTAN, ANNIE MAE SMITH, RIA JAIRAM, ELIZABETH HOLLOWAY, BRITTNEY PETTITA, CYNTHIA CONNOR, KARLI PARKER, JO ANN BUCK, WILLIAM LINDSAY, MOISES PEREZ, SHANNON WALDEN, CAROLYN GREEN, JOYCE ROSSELLI, NAOMI JAWOROWSKI, LATEASE RIKARD, WILLIAM INFIELD, NOEL BENADOM, LUCINDA DIRKS, filed by JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA, ANN DAVIS, Ashley Finch, NANCY INFIELD, DARLANE SARACINA, ELLA GULLY, DEANNA TAYLOR, JOHN BRILEY, ROSE MARIE PERRY, MICHAEL RUTAN, ANNIE MAE SMITH, RIA JAIRAM, ELIZABETH HOLLOWAY, BRITTNEY PETTITA, CYNTHIA CONNOR, KARLI PARKER, JO ANN BUCK, WILLIAM LINDSAY, MOISES PEREZ, SHANNON WALDEN, CAROLYN GREEN, JOYCE ROSSELLI, NAOMI JAWOROWSKI, LATEASE RIKARD, WILLIAM INFIELD, NOEL BENADOM, LUCINDA DIRKS.(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 14, 2019 Filing 103 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Corrected Order Regarding Leadership re #99 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 13, 2019 Filing 102 Transcript of Hearing held on November 6, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 12/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2020. (bt, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TEXT ORDER: The next in-person conference will be held on 12/13/2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. For those appearing telephonically, dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/8/2019.(jqb, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 - Appointing MDL Lead Counsel: James F. Cecchi, etc., Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/5/19. (gh, )
November 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 11/6/2019. (ECR) (jqb, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that any motion to dismiss shall be filed on or by 1/15/2020, and setting in-person status conference. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/6/2019. (dam, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/6/19. (lag, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. BUCHANAN on behalf of JORGE M FERNANDEZ, JR., HECTOR J. VALDES (BUCHANAN, DAVID)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER: In addition to today's in-person conference, the Court has set up a conference call. Please dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference call. The conference will start at 10:00 sharp. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/6/2019. (jqb, ) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jqb, ).
November 5, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBYN MARA FELDSTEIN on behalf of BIO-REFERENCE LABORATORIES, INC. (FELDSTEIN, ROBYN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 94 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 4, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL COCHRAN CRAIG on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. (CRAIG, DANIEL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 92 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Enclosing Proposed Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
November 1, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ANDREW INNES on behalf of MARK JOHNSTON(Plaintiff in 19-13957), JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (INNES, MICHAEL)
November 1, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of MARK JOHNSTON(Plaintiff in 19-13957), JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (BARTLETT, CAROLINE)
October 25, 2019 Filing 88 Letter from Michael T. Hensley on behalf of Quest to Judge Arleo re: coordination with State Court Action. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 87 Letter from Bradley J. Bartolomeo to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo re coordination with state court matter. (BARTOLOMEO, BRADLEY)
October 22, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by MARYBETH V. GIBSON on behalf of ERIN THERESA GRAY (GIBSON, MARYBETH)
October 21, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE by QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED of filing Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Dkt. No. 27 in 2:19-cv-17638 (JOYCE, EAMON)
October 7, 2019 Filing 84 Letter from Melissa Emert re #38 Application/Petition. (EMERT, MELISSA)
October 7, 2019 Filing 83 APPLICATION/PETITION for Appointment of Emily J Seikel to PSC [SUPPLEMENT] for by ERICKSON J OCASIO. (SEIKEL, EMILY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 82 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Plaintiff Leadership Structure re #78 Letter, #79 Letter, #42 Letter,, #80 Application/Petition, #81 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(CECCHI, JAMES)
October 7, 2019 Filing 81 Letter from Rosemary M. Rivas in Further Support of Individual Application for Leadership Appointment. (RIVAS, ROSEMARY)
October 7, 2019 Filing 80 APPLICATION/PETITION for by PERNELL THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(SCHWABA, ANDREW)
October 7, 2019 Filing 79 Letter from Katrina Carroll in Further Support of Individual Application for Leadership Appointment. (CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 6, 2019 Filing 78 Letter from Allison Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(RYAN, ALLISON)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 11/4/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/3/2019. (jqb, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by JEAN SUTTON MARTIN on behalf of DENISE BROWN-WELLS (MARTIN, JEAN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN AUSTIN MOORE on behalf of MARK JOHNSTON(Plaintiff in 19-13957) (MOORE, JOHN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL M. STEPHAN on behalf of Emily Smith, Peter D. Smith (STEPHAN, PAUL)
October 1, 2019 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Status Conference held on 10/1/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (aa, )
October 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Hearing held on 10/1/2019. (Court Reporter Charles McGuire) (jqb, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by BARRETT JAY VAHLE on behalf of MARK JOHNSTON(Plaintiff in 19-13957) (VAHLE, BARRETT)
September 30, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by NORMAN E. SIEGEL on behalf of MARK JOHNSTON(Plaintiff in 19-13957) (SIEGEL, NORMAN)
September 30, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD W. CIOLKO on behalf of Matthew Webb (CIOLKO, EDWARD)
September 30, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD C. WERTS on behalf of Ashley Finch, David Finch (WERTS, TODD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES E. SCHAFFER on behalf of MARY BOWERS, SCARLETTE JONES (SCHAFFER, CHARLES)
September 26, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE DAVID KING on behalf of Kaesha Gaye Camilia Henry (KING, LAURENCE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS J. MCNAMARA on behalf of Emily Smith, Peter D. Smith (MCNAMARA, DOUGLAS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by JON LAMBIRAS on behalf of FRANCIS CARBONNEAU (LAMBIRAS, JON)
September 25, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by E. MICHELLE DRAKE on behalf of FRANCIS CARBONNEAU (DRAKE, E.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY KEITH KING on behalf of TIM COLLINSWORTH, CLYDE FREEMAN, Paula Worthey (KING, BRADLEY)
September 24, 2019 Filing 63 STATUS REPORT Joint Agenda and Status Report For October 1, 2019 Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CECCHI, JAMES)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #55 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #56 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DONALD M. HOUSER, ESQ and KRISTINE MCALISTER BROWN, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/23/2019. (dam, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 57 Letter from Reade W. Seligmann. (SELIGMANN, READE)
September 20, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN J. HAWAL on behalf of JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (dam, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN NEMATZADEH on behalf of JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (dam, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY E. KELLER on behalf of JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (dam, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM J LEVITT on behalf of JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(dam, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kristine McAlister Brown by OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., OPTUM360, LLC, UNITED HEALTH GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristine McAlister Brown, #2 Declaration of Reade Seligman, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SELIGMANN, READE)
September 18, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /Corrected Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hav Vice for Donald M. Houser by OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., OPTUM360, LLC, UNITED HEALTH GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald M. Houser, #2 Declaration of Reade Seligmann, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SELIGMANN, READE)
September 18, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Donald M. Houser by UNITED HEALTH GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald M. Houser, #2 Declaration Reade W. Seligmann, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SELIGMANN, READE)
September 18, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN on behalf of UNITED HEALTH GROUP (SELIGMANN, READE)
September 18, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. GEORGE on behalf of ROBERT CORWIN, CINDY FARBER, JORGE M FERNANDEZ, JR., Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, ZAKARIA HAQUE, MARK MEISEL, Rosa Villarreal, LORI WEINRIB (GEORGE, SCOTT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 51 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Corrected Proposed CMO-2 re #44 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
September 17, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M. NATHAN on behalf of NOEL BENADOM, TATYANA SHULMAN (NATHAN, STEVEN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by KATIE ROSE BERAN on behalf of NOEL BENADOM, TATYANA SHULMAN (BERAN, KATIE)
September 17, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES JOSEPH PIZZIRUSSO on behalf of NOEL BENADOM, TATYANA SHULMAN (PIZZIRUSSO, JAMES)
September 17, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART A. DAVIDSON on behalf of JORGE M FERNANDEZ, JR. (DAVIDSON, STUART)
September 16, 2019 Filing 46 APPLICATION/PETITION for Appointment of Andrew J. Schwaba to Executive Committee for by PERNELL THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Schwaba, #2 Declaration of Edward H. Nicholson)(SCHWABA, ANDREW)
September 16, 2019 Filing 45 Letter from Katrina Carroll - Application for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
September 16, 2019 Filing 44 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed CMO-2 re #42 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
September 16, 2019 Filing 43 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Service List re #9 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Service List)(CECCHI, JAMES)
September 16, 2019 Filing 42 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Leadership Structure re #9 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(CECCHI, JAMES)
September 16, 2019 Filing 41 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Appointment of James A Barry to the Plaintiff's Executive Committee for by MOHAMAD MOHAMAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV of James A Barry)(BARRY, JAMES)
September 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY G. BLOOD on behalf of Sean DeMarco (BLOOD, TIMOTHY)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 APPLICATION/PETITION for Ivy T. Ngo to be Appointed to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee or Executive Committee for by JENNIFER RABEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - A Seat at the Table)(NGO, IVY)
September 15, 2019 Filing 38 APPLICATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF MELISSA R. EMERT TO PLAINTIFFS STEERING COMMITTEE/EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE by BRIAN D GRAIFMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(EMERT, MELISSA) Modified on 9/16/2019 (dam, ).
September 15, 2019 Filing 37 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Appointment of Emily J. Seikel to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for by ERICKSON J OCASIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SEIKEL, EMILY)
September 13, 2019 Filing 36 APPLICATION/PETITION for APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ROSEMARY M. RIVAS AS CO- LEAD COUNSEL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO THE PLAINTIFFS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE/STEERING COMMITTEE for by Glenn French, Wendy Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(RIVAS, ROSEMARY)
September 13, 2019 Filing 35 APPLICATION/PETITION for Nomination for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for by MARY BOWERS, SCARLETTE JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFFER, CHARLES)
September 13, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES A. BARRY on behalf of MOHAMAD MOHAMAD (BARRY, JAMES)
September 13, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by EVELYN CRYSTAL LOPEZ on behalf of Inform Diagnostics Inc. (LOPEZ, EVELYN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. FANNING, JR on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA (FANNING, EDWARD)
September 11, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. COONER on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA (COONER, DAVID)
September 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA R. EMERT on behalf of BRIAN D GRAIFMAN (EMERT, MELISSA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY S. GRAIFMAN on behalf of BRIAN D GRAIFMAN (GRAIFMAN, GARY)
September 5, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID CURRY DILL on behalf of CARECENTRIX, INC. (DILL, DAVID)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by LANE WHITTAKER DAVIS on behalf of CARECENTRIX, INC. (DAVIS, LANE)
September 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM STEVENS BROWN on behalf of CARECENTRIX, INC. (BROWN, WILLIAM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Plaintiff Leadership Submissions re #9 Order,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by GRADY REEDER CAMPION on behalf of Inform Diagnostics Inc. (CAMPION, GRADY)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN MICHAEL MCGINTY on behalf of Inform Diagnostics Inc. (MCGINTY, KEVIN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD SETH GARBER on behalf of Edgar Gutierrez (GARBER, TODD)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JOE P. LENISKI on behalf of GENE HIVELY (LENISKI, JOE)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY JAY SEIKEL on behalf of ERICKSON J OCASIO (SEIKEL, EMILY)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID HENRY HOFFMAN on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. (HOFFMAN, DAVID)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM B. FEDERMAN on behalf of ERICKSON J OCASIO (FEDERMAN, WILLIAM)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM HARRIS COHEN on behalf of JOHN CARROLL, GABRIEL MOLINA (COHEN, ADAM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSEMARY M. RIVAS on behalf of Wendy Wallach, Glenn French (RIVAS, ROSEMARY)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN on behalf of OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., OPTUM360, LLC (SELIGMANN, READE)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by EAMON PAUL JOYCE on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. (JOYCE, EAMON)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON M. RYAN on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA (RYAN, ALLISON)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON LOUIS LICHTMAN on behalf of JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (LICHTMAN, JASON)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER H. SCHMIDT on behalf of Douglas Dermody, Daniela Goyer (SCHMIDT, ALEXANDER)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO #3) transferring an action to this Court. (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - James E. Cecchi, Esq., appointed as interim lead counsel for Plaintiffs; by 9/15/19 interim counsel shall provide the Court with a list of attorneys, etc; Joint Agenda and Status Report to be submitted by 9/24/19; Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/1/19 at 11AM. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/21/19. (gh, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. (EFFINGHAM, ANN)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. HENSLEY on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC. (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. DEPALMA on behalf of NOEL BENADOM, DEANNA RAHILL (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO #2) transferring certain actions to this Court (gh, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO #1) transferring certain actions to this Court (gh, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSEY H. TAYLOR on behalf of MARK JOHNSTON, JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. CECCHI on behalf of JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA, MARK JOHNSTON (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. on 7/31/2019. (mfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360, LLC
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTIC INCORPORATED
Represented By: MICHAEL T. HENSLEY
Represented By: ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM
Represented By: EAMON PAUL JOYCE
Represented By: DAVID HENRY HOFFMAN
Represented By: DANIEL COCHRAN CRAIG
Represented By: JORKEELL ECHEVERRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Represented By: DAVID J. COONER
Represented By: EDWARD J. FANNING, JR.
Represented By: ALLISON M. RYAN
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: SCOTT ELLIOTT BAYZLE
Represented By: MICHELLE ANNE KISLOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIO-REFERENCE LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: PAUL G KARLSGODT
Represented By: ROBYN MARA FELDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inform Diagnostics Inc.
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL MCGINTY
Represented By: EVELYN CRYSTAL LOPEZ
Represented By: GRADY REEDER CAMPION
Represented By: PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINICAL PATHOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS CLINICAL LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL T. HENSLEY
Represented By: ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM
Represented By: EAMON PAUL JOYCE
Represented By: DAVID HENRY HOFFMAN
Represented By: DANIEL COCHRAN CRAIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTH GROUP
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: DAVID J. COONER
Represented By: EDWARD J. FANNING, JR.
Represented By: ALLISON M. RYAN
Represented By: CATHERINE R. L. LAWSON
Represented By: SCOTT ELLIOTT BAYZLE
Represented By: MICHELLE ANNE KISLOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARECENTRIX, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM STEVENS BROWN
Represented By: DAVID CURRY DILL
Represented By: LANE WHITTAKER DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE MEDICAL LABORATORIES
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ESOTERIC LABORATORIES
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATHOLOGY SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONIC HEALTHCARE USA
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEACOAST PATHOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH TEXAS DERMATOLOGY LAB, PLLC
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBL PATH
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARIZONA DERMATOPATHOLOGY
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA DIAGNOSTICS LLC
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY DERMATOLOGY ADX, LLC
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN PATHOLOGY CONSULTANTS, LTD
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY MEDICINE CONSULTANTS, LTD
Represented By: BRADLEY JASON BARTOLOMEO
Represented By: JEFFREY SPIEGEL
Represented By: ARIADNE PANAGOPOULOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC. d/b/a American Medical Collection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE M FERNANDEZ, JR.
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: STUART A. DAVIDSON
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: DAVID R. BUCHANAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS CARBONNEAU
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: JON LAMBIRAS
Represented By: E. MICHELLE DRAKE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK JOHNSTON
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW INNES
Represented By: JOHN AUSTIN MOORE
Represented By: BARRETT JAY VAHLE
Represented By: NORMAN E. SIEGEL
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR J. VALDES
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: DAVID R. BUCHANAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIO ANTONIO PEREZ VIEYRA
Represented By: LINDSEY H. TAYLOR
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: JASON LOUIS LICHTMAN
Represented By: JUSTIN J. HAWAL
Represented By: ADAM J LEVITT
Represented By: AMY E. KELLER
Represented By: JUSTIN NEMATZADEH
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW INNES
Represented By: CAROLINE F. BARTLETT
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Mayer
Represented By: Jerusalem F Beligan
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN D GRAIFMAN
Represented By: HOWARD THEODORE LONGMAN
Represented By: MELISSA R. EMERT
Represented By: GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Goyer
Represented By: ALEXANDER H. SCHMIDT
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI JOHNS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Dirrim
Represented By: BRIAN C. GUDMUNDSON
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY BOWERS
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Wallach
Represented By: ROSEMARY M. RIVAS
Represented By: EDUARD KORSINSKY
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH HOLLWAY
Represented By: PHILIP LAWRENCE FRAIETTA
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE BROWN-WELLS
Represented By: JEAN SUTTON MARTIN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Jilek
Represented By: ERIC H. GIBBS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hayhurst
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY NEAL
Represented By: DURAN LAWRENCE KELLER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter D. Smith
Represented By: DOUGLAS J. MCNAMARA
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: PAUL M. STEPHAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Gras
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Kerns
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CARROLL
Represented By: LEIGH SMITH
Represented By: ADAM HARRIS COHEN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMAD MOHAMAD
Represented By: JAMES A. BARRY
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaesha Gaye Camilia Henry
Represented By: JOEL B. STRAUSS
Represented By: LAURENCE DAVID KING
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK ROGGE
Represented By: DURAN LAWRENCE KELLER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Marler
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN THERESA GRAY
Represented By: J BENJAMIN FINLEY
Represented By: MARYBETH V. GIBSON
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER RABEN
Represented By: IVY T. NGO
Represented By: Alexander F. Beale
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK WOODS
Represented By: Justin F Marquez
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANNAH WEISS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOEL BENADOM
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: KATIE ROSE BERAN
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH PIZZIRUSSO
Represented By: STEVEN M. NATHAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: JASON TODD DENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Eggins
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GUGLIELMO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritzie Key
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Finch
Represented By: Ryan M. Callahan
Represented By: TODD C. WERTS
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Smith
Represented By: DOUGLAS J. MCNAMARA
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: PAUL M. STEPHAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Gutierrez
Represented By: Chantal Khalil
Represented By: TODD SETH GARBER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Worthey
Represented By: BRADLEY KEITH KING
Represented By: MICHAEL HAYDEN REED
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Grossman
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMI SHAPIRO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTorrie Glover-Brown
Represented By: ERIC H. GIBBS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ryan
Represented By: MARC L. GODINO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Webb
Represented By: KATRINA CARROLL
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GUGLIELMO
Represented By: EDWARD W. CIOLKO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN LEVY
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLYDE FREEMAN
Represented By: BRADLEY KEITH KING
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TATYANA SHULMAN
Represented By: DAVID MATTHEW WILKERSON
Represented By: KATIE ROSE BERAN
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH PIZZIRUSSO
Represented By: STEVEN M. NATHAN
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Represented By: JASON TODD DENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY DUONG
Represented By: DURAN LAWRENCE KELLER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI WEINRIB
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICKSON J OCASIO
Represented By: WILLIAM B. FEDERMAN
Represented By: EMILY JAY SEIKEL
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAKARIA HAQUE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean DeMarco
Represented By: TIMOTHY G. BLOOD
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Dermody
Represented By: ALEXANDER H. SCHMIDT
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCARLETTE JONES
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satoria Monlyn
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GUGLIELMO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnetta Huffman
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT OSWALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ryan
Represented By: MARC L. GODINO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ROSENTHAL
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA RAHILL
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM COLLINSWORTH
Represented By: BRADLEY KEITH KING
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Allende
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Laughlin
Represented By: BRIAN C. GUDMUNDSON
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DeMarshall
Represented By: Brant D Penney
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL MOLINA
Represented By: LEIGH SMITH
Represented By: ADAM HARRIS COHEN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MEISEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT CORWIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Cinelli
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: JOSEPH P. GUGLIELMO
Represented By: CAREY ALEXANDER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENE HIVELY
Represented By: JOE P. LENISKI
Represented By: NARENDRA K. GHOSH
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Finch
Represented By: Ryan M. Callahan
Represented By: TODD C. WERTS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERNELL THOMAS
Represented By: ANDREW J. SCHWABA
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL CHUHA
Represented By: GARY F. LYNCH
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY FARBER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emory Grauberger
Represented By: SEYED ABBAS KAZEROUNIAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Ottmann
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn French
Represented By: ROSEMARY M. RIVAS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Villarreal
Represented By: PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA
Represented By: SCOTT A. GEORGE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lanouette
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.D.
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMI JAWOROWSKI
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIA JAIRAM
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMMIE MARTIN
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRIE PALMER
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLANE SARACINA
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOISES PEREZ
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BRILEY
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATEASE RIKARD
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMERON SPENCER
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSARIA GLADERO
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA WRENN
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL DAVIS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI LAMONDIE-MURPHY
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN DUCKWORTH
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISAAC WILLIAMS-WINTERS
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE DRAGOO
Represented By: CORY M TEED
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE ROSSELLI
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN NELSON-CARTER
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE SCOTT
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDITH THROWER
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN GREEN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Whalen
Represented By: Brian Phillip Murray
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA DRISKELL
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLA GULLY
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTNEY PETTITA
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA TAYLOR
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL KAPLAN
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY SCHWALL
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBBIE AMICO
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY INFIELD
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA EVANS
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE VAZQUEZ
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM PARROTT
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA HARRIS
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RUTAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCINDA DIRKS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEO GALLAGHER-KOWIT
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN STOREY
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE MAE SMITH
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HALEY
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDR NAZEMINIKOV
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONDA TATE
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE LEBON
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWENDOLYN ANDERSON
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA JERRY
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEERA HARRIS
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE MARIE PERRY
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JO ANN BUCK
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA CUVILLIER
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLY LAUFENBERG
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GRUSHKA
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN APONTE
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY BUHR
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA CONNOR
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM INFIELD
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH HOLLOWAY
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY JUDELSOHN
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON WALDEN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY STEED
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE ROTHWELL
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA LASSITER
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATLIN STANFORD
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD STONE
Represented By: CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY GOINS
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LINDSAY
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN DAVIS
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARLI PARKER
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY PETRI
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTOPHER THOMAS
Represented By: MARY L. RUSSELL
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN D. GRAIFMAN
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?