KHAN et al v. PICCINI LLP et al
Plaintiff: MAHAMED KHAN and AZMA A KHAN
Defendant: JANE DOE, EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, JOHN DOE and BERTONE PICCINI LLP
Case Number: 2:2020cv00200
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BERTONE PICCINI LLP re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (CAREY, EVA)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 Motion in Opposition filed by MAHAMED KHAN re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bt, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BERTONE PICCINI LLP re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (CAREY, EVA)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BERTONE PICCINI LLP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
February 7, 2020 COMPLAINT against EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BERTONE PICCINI LLP with JURY DEMAND, filed by MAHAMED KHAN, AZMA A KHAN. (See D.E. #1 )(ams, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by MAHAMED KHAN (bt, )
February 3, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number NEW041866 (bt, )
January 30, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #2 Motion to Dismiss, signature page by EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BERTONE PICCINI LLP. (CAREY, EVA)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EVA K CAREY on behalf of EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BERTONE PICCINI LLP (CAREY, EVA)
January 21, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion to Dismiss #2 submitted by Grace Bertone, Esq. on 1/21/2020 contains an improper signature. The Motion documents were signed by Eva K. Carey, Esq. Please RESUBMIT the Signature Pages. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sms)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by EVA K. CAREY, JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BERTONE PICCINI LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of E Carey in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Brief Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BERTONE, GRACE)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHAN et al v. PICCINI LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVA K. CAREY
Represented By: GRACE CATHERINE BERTONE
Represented By: EVA K CAREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE MORGAN NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: GRACE CATHERINE BERTONE
Represented By: EVA K CAREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERTONE PICCINI LLP
Represented By: GRACE CATHERINE BERTONE
Represented By: EVA K CAREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHAMED KHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZMA A KHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?