EZEKWO et al v. CITY OF ENGLEWOOD et al
Plaintiff: CHUKWUEMEKA EZEKWO and IFEOMA EZEKWO
Defendant: THORNTON WHTE, ERIC DOLPHY, SUEZ WATER COMPANY, MICHAEL CHRISTIANSEN, ENGLEWOOD POLICE DEPT., WALTER DEPUTCH, JOHN DOE 1-10, GERALD ORATIO, AISHAAH RASUL, BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, CHRISTOPHER QUIRK, WANDA FAULK, JANE DOE 1-10, CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, NEW JERSEY, DEBBIE BARR, TYREE BALMER, CAPTAIN GRIFITH and EMILY LYONS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00480
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply. Attorney DAVID J. PACK for TYREE BALMER,DAVID J. PACK for MICHAEL CHRISTIANSEN,DAVID J. PACK for CITY OF ENGLEWOOD,DAVID J. PACK for WALTER DEPUTCH,DAVID J. PACK for ERIC DOLPHY,DAVID J. PACK for ENGLEWOOD POLICE DEPT.,DAVID J. PACK for WANDA FAULK,DAVID J. PACK for GERALD ORATIO,DAVID J. PACK for CHRISTOPHER QUIRK,DAVID J. PACK for AISHAAH RASUL,DAVID J. PACK for THORNTON WHTE added. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(PACK, DAVID)
March 6, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order,, submitted by CHRISTOPHER QUIRK, MICHAEL CHRISTIANSEN, AISHAAH RASUL, CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, WANDA FAULK, THORNTON WHTE, ENGLEWOOD POLICE DEPT., WALTER DEPUTCH, TYREE BALMER, DEBBIE BARR, ERIC DOLPHY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/25/2020. (bt, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from CHUKWUEMEKA EZEKWO. (cds)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Bergen County Sheriff's Office, Bergen County Sheriff's Office Captain Michael Griffin, and Bergen County Sheriff's Officer Emily Lyons. Attorney DANIEL ERIC ZWILLENBERG for BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE,DANIEL ERIC ZWILLENBERG for CAPTAIN GRIFITH added. (ZWILLENBERG, DANIEL)
March 2, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by CAPTAIN GRIFITH, BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, EMILY LYONS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/19/2020. (bt, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER G. PAPPAS on behalf of SUEZ WATER COMPANY (PAPPAS, ALEXANDER)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of SUEZ WATER COMPANY (KANG, GENE)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN R ADE on behalf of SUEZ WATER COMPANY (ADE, BRIAN)
February 26, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SUEZ WATER COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/18/2020. (bt, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to defendant, SUEZ Water New Jersey Inc.. Attorney BRIAN R ADE for SUEZ WATER COMPANY added. (ADE, BRIAN)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TYREE BALMER, DEBBIE BARR, BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, CAPTAIN GRIFITH, MICHAEL CHRISTIANSEN, CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, WALTER DEPUTCH, ERIC DOLPHY, ENGLEWOOD POLICE DEPT., WANDA FAULK, NEW JERSEY, GERALD ORATIO, CHRISTOPHER QUIRK, AISHAAH RASUL, SUEZ WATER COMPANY, THORNTON WHTE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TYREE BALMER, DEBBIE BARR, BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, CAPTAIN GRIFITH, MICHAEL CHRISTIANSEN, CITY OF ENGLEWOOD, WALTER DEPUTCH, ERIC DOLPHY, ENGLEWOOD POLICE DEPT., WANDA FAULK, JANE DOE 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, NEW JERSEY, GERALD ORATIO, CHRISTOPHER QUIRK, AISHAAH RASUL, SUEZ WATER COMPANY, THORNTON WHTE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW041667), filed by CHUKWUEMEKA EZEKWO, IFEOMA EZEKWO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EZEKWO et al v. CITY OF ENGLEWOOD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHUKWUEMEKA EZEKWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IFEOMA EZEKWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THORNTON WHTE
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC DOLPHY
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUEZ WATER COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Represented By: ALEXANDER G. PAPPAS
Represented By: BRIAN R ADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CHRISTIANSEN
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENGLEWOOD POLICE DEPT.
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER DEPUTCH
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD ORATIO
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AISHAAH RASUL
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGEN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
Represented By: DANIEL ERIC ZWILLENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER QUIRK
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA FAULK
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ENGLEWOOD
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYREE BALMER
Represented By: DAVID J. PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN GRIFITH
Represented By: DANIEL ERIC ZWILLENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY LYONS
Represented By: DANIEL ERIC ZWILLENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?