CORSON v. PARATHA JUNCTION LLC.
Plaintiff: LISA CORSON
Defendant: PARATHA JUNCTION LLC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00573
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LISA CORSON. PARATHA JUNCTION LLC. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (PARKER, ROBERT)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PARATHA JUNCTION LLC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (ams, )
January 16, 2020 Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARATHA JUNCTION LLC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10257754) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LISA CORSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-original image, #2 Exhibit B-registration certificate, #3 Exhibit C-screenshots, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(PARKER, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORSON v. PARATHA JUNCTION LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARATHA JUNCTION LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA CORSON
Represented By: ROBERT TERRY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?