Dunson et al v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Dunson and Shaun Dunson
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-#10, ABC CORPORATION'S 1-10, ASTRAZENECA LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, JANE DOE #1-10, PFIZER INC, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY and ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
In Re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00789
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Member Case Transferred in on 1/23/20 from the Western District of Missouri 4:20-00008 for MDL 2789 - PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (gh, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
January 23, 2020 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:20-cv-00008. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-26, from John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to District of New Jersey to be included in MDL No. 2789. Signed on 1/23/2020. Case electronically transferred. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Ellis, Lindsey)
January 22, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Astrazeneca, LP, Pfizer, Inc. (Melvin, Greg)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporations 1-10, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Astrazeneca, LP, Jane Doe 1-10, John Doe 1-10, Pfizer, Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, The filed by Gerald Gray, II on behalf of Shaun Dunson, Stephen Dunson. Filing fee $400, receipt number BMOWDC-6652484. Service due by 4/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gray, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunson et al v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-#10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION'S 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Dunson
Represented By: DAVID L. MARCUS
Represented By: Gerald Gray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Dunson
Represented By: DAVID L. MARCUS
Represented By: Gerald Gray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?