FUNG v. WELLS FARGO BANK et al
Plaintiff: GAIL FUNG
Defendant: FULL SPECTRUM SERVICES INC, HSBC BANK, MR. JASON HONG, BEC FNF, LLC, JOHN M. ANELLO, ESQ., PHELAN, HALLINAN, DIAMOND, JONES AND SCHMEIG, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, WELLS FARGO BANK, JUDITH T. ROMANO, ESQ., LICARDO GWIRA, ESQ. and JAMES DIMAGGIO, ESQ.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01099
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1355
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The #14 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HSBC BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/13/20. (jc, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and HSBC Bank USA, N.A... (BETTINO, DIANE)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER; denying without prejudice #10 Plaintiff's Motion for the appointment of pro bono counsel; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/11/2020. (sms)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Gail Fung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Page of Mortgage Note etc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Discharge of Mortgage etc., #3 Exhibi 3 - Wells Fargo Bank Letter of Apology, #4 Exhibit 4 - Gail Fung - Home etc., #5 Exhibit 5 - Erica Wilburne etc., #6 Exhibit 6 - Seung Wong Back etc., #7 Exhibit 7 - Former Closing Attorney Robert Hennessey etc., #8 Envelope) (jc, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN M. ANELLO, ESQ., BEC FNF, LLC, JAMES DIMAGGIO, ESQ., FULL SPECTRUM SERVICES INC, LICARDO GWIRA, ESQ., JASON HONG, HSBC BANK, PHELAN, HALLINAN, DIAMOND, JONES AND SCHMEIG, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, JUDITH T. ROMANO, ESQ., WELLS FARGO BANK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by GAIL FUNG. (jc, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number NEW042323 (jc, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against JOHN M. ANELLO, ESQ., BEC FNF, LLC, JAMES DIMAGGIO, ESQ., FULL SPECTRUM SERVICES INC, LICARDO GWIRA, ESQ., JASON HONG, HSBC BANK, PHELAN, HALLINAN, DIAMOND, JONES AND SCHMEIG, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, JUDITH T. ROMANO, ESQ., WELLS FARGO BANK, filed by GAIL FUNG. (See D.E. 1 for documents) (jc, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard the March 6, 2020 Clerk's Text Order. The #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by HSBC BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, should not have been granted since the Complaint has not yet been filed. (jc, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying Plaintiff's IFP Application. Based on the information provided by Plaintiff in her IFP application, which indicates she receives an unidentified amount of disability income in addition to $2,650 per month in income from real property, the Court finds Plaintiff has not demonstrated an inability to pay the filing and docketing fees, etc. The Clerk is to close the file and administratively terminate all pending motions. Plaintiff may submit payment in the amount of $400 within 14 days from the date of this Order to reopen the case without further action from the Court. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/6/20. (jc, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: In view of the outstanding IFP Application (ECF No. #1 ), the Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel (ECF No. #2 ) is hereby DENIED without prejudice as premature with leave to refile. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/6/2020. (as, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by HSBC BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/31/20. (jc, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter from Diane A. Bettino, Esq. re #3 MOTION to Vacate. (BETTINO, DIANE)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and HSBC Bank. Attorney DIANE A. BETTINO for HSBC BANK,DIANE A. BETTINO for WELLS FARGO BANK added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of HSBC BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK (BETTINO, DIANE)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER on behalf of HSBC BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK (BUTTNER, ETHAN)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Vacate Sheriff Sale from December 20, 2019 by GAIL FUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PA Bar, Romano, Judith T., #2 Exhibit 2 - Forged Assignment of Mortgage for 545 Ryeside Ave, etc., #3 Exhibit 3 - Judith T. Romano, General Counsel, Phelan Hall, #4 Exhibit 4 - Wells Fargo VP of Loan Documentation Fraud, #5 Exhibit 5 - Memorandum Order from Eastern District PA Case No. 11-2596, #6 Exhibit 6 - Copy of Loan Modification with Wells Fargo Listed as "Lender", #7 Exhibit 7 - Wrongful Denial of Loan Modification Applications, Wells Fargo Lett, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Farm Home Owners Policy Naming Wells Fargo Bank as Mortgagee, #9 Exhibit 9 - Time Line of Home Ownership Since 2006-2020, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letter to MERS Requesting Proof of Mortgage Note on Property 545 R, #11 Exhibit 11 - MERS Proof of Mortgage Note on Property 545 Ryeside Ave etc., #12 Exhibit 12 - Chase Bank Statement etc., #13 Exhibit 13 - Sheriff Sale of 545 Ryeside Ave etc.) (jc, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by GAIL FUNG. (jc, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Notifications, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 1 - PA Bar, Romano, Judith T., #5 Exhibit 2 - Forged Assignment of Mortgage for 545 Ryeside Ave, etc., #6 Exhibit 3 - Judith T. Romano, General Counsel, Phelan Hall, #7 Exhibit 4 - Wells Fargo VP of Loan Documentation Fraud, #8 Exhibit 5 - Memorandum Order from Eastern District PA Case No. 11-2596, #9 Exhibit 6 - Copy of Loan Modification with Wells Fargo Listed as "Lender", #10 Exhibit 7 - Wrongful Denial of Loan Modification Applications, Wells Fargo Letter of Apology, #11 Exhibit 8 - State Farm Home Owners Policy Naming Wells Fargo Bank as Mortgagee Effective Date 12/11/2019-12/11/2020, #12 Exhibit 9 - Time Line of Home Ownership Since 2006-2020, #13 Exhibit 10 - Letter to MERS Requesting Proof of Mortgage Note on Property 545 Ryeside Ave etc., #14 Exhibit 11 - MERS Proof of Mortgage Note on Property 545 Ryeside Ave etc., #15 Exhibit 12 - Chase Bank Statement etc., #16 Exhibit 13 - Sheriff Sale of 545 Ryeside Ave etc.) (jc, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/31/2020) (jc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FUNG v. WELLS FARGO BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL FUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULL SPECTRUM SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK
Represented By: ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. JASON HONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEC FNF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN M. ANELLO, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHELAN, HALLINAN, DIAMOND, JONES AND SCHMEIG, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK
Represented By: ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH T. ROMANO, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LICARDO GWIRA, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES DIMAGGIO, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?