NEW JERSEY TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. CECERE et al
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: FRANK J. COZZARELLI and JOHN DOES #1-10
3Rd Party Plaintiff: RICHARD CECERE, ROSEMARIE CECERE, CHAMPION MORTGAGE and WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: ABC CORP/LLC #1-10, SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT and MARGARET HARKNESS
Case Number: 2:2020cv01286
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 4/20/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim and motion to vacate state court default by SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Derya Samadi, #3 Declaration of Ben Kuruvilla, #4 Exhibit A (State Court Default request and affidavit of service on HUD), #5 Exhibit B (State Court case jacket), #6 Exhibit C (Third-Party Complaint), #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(KURUVILLA, BEN)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCESCA ANN ARCURE on behalf of CHAMPION MORTGAGE (ARCURE, FRANCESCA)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON M. BENDER on behalf of MARGARET HARKNESS, WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. (BENDER, AARON)
February 9, 2020 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (ps, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT from New Jersey Superior Court, Essex County, Chancery Division - General Equity Part, case number ESX-C-212-17., filed by SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint with attachments), #2 Exhibit B (Third-Party Complaint with attachments), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(KURUVILLA, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. CECERE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: RICHARD CECERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ROSEMARIE CECERE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CHAMPION MORTGAGE
Represented By: FRANCESCA ANN ARCURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Represented By: AARON M. BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ABC CORP/LLC #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SECRETARY OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: BEN KURUVILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MARGARET HARKNESS
Represented By: AARON M. BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK J. COZZARELLI
Represented By: FRANK J. COZZARELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?