KAMINO LLC v. CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: KAMINO LLC
Defendant: CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01287
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 4/16/20 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/19/20. (tjg, )
March 19, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CASIO AMERICA, INC. identifying Casio Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (LIEB, KATHERINE)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by CASIO AMERICA, INC..(LIEB, KATHERINE)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE MARGUERITE LIEB on behalf of CASIO AMERICA, INC. (LIEB, KATHERINE)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CASIO AMERICA, INC.. (LUKSENBERG, STEVEN)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN Z. LUKSENBERG on behalf of CASIO AMERICA, INC. (LUKSENBERG, STEVEN)
March 2, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Extension of time to File Answer submitted by CASIO AMERICA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/17/2020. (ld, )
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez, Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/19/20. (ak, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CASIO AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, )
February 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (ro, )
February 9, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KAMINO LLC. (WEINBLATT, RICHARD)
February 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by KAMINO LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (WEINBLATT, RICHARD)
February 9, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (ps, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued as to CASIO AMERICA, INC.. (WEINBLATT, RICHARD) Modified on 2/7/2020 (dam, ).
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CASIO AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10378660) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KAMINO LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WEINBLATT, RICHARD) Modified on 2/7/2020 (dam, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAMINO LLC v. CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMINO LLC
Represented By: RICHARD CHARLES WEINBLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASIO AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD CHARLES WEINBLATT
Represented By: KATHERINE MARGUERITE LIEB
Represented By: STEVEN Z. LUKSENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?