Kirschner et al v. McClain et al
Plaintiff: Marc S. Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Gerald C. Crotty, Pamela M. Paul, Suzanne Maloney, Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Jack Gross, John T. McClain, Susan M. McCoy, John D'Souza, Defendant NJ-1, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Alison Hemming, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Arlene Starr, Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Mark DeZao, Ninive Giordano, Charles L. Pickett, Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Prudential Financial, Inc., Defendant NJ-2, Irene A. Koumendouros, Vincent Morales, Defendant NJ-4, Arundhati Kulkarni, Tami Fersko, Ira Margulies, Jeffrey Brisman, Patricia Kenny, Defendant NJ-3, Quantitative Management Associates LLC, Arthur E. Lee, Nancy L. Lee and PRIAC FUNDS
Case Number: 2:2020cv01768
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: James B Clark
2 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
3 Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ERIC B. FISHER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
April 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GREGORY C. PRUDEN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 77 Copy of NOTICE of Appearance submitted to the U.S. Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (th, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 75 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric B. Fisher to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10693533.) (RYAN, KRISTINE)
April 16, 2020 Filing 74 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory C. Pruden to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10693407.) (RYAN, KRISTINE)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory C. Pruden, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/8/2020. (ld, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric B. Fisher, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/8/2020. (ld, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (RYAN, KRISTINE)
April 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #69 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Eric B. Fisher, #70 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Gregory C. Pruden. Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Gregory C. Pruden by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Hon. James B. Clark, III, #2 Certification of Gregory C. Pruden, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RYAN, KRISTINE)
April 7, 2020 Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certification of Kristine V. Ryan in Support of Pro Hac Admission of Eric B. Fisher by Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Hon. James B. Clark, III per Local Civil Rule 101.1, #2 Certification of Eric B. Fisher, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RYAN, KRISTINE)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff's and Defendant Arlene Starr ("Defendant"), that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 4, 2020, shall be extended from March 25,2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/6/2020. (sms)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff's and Defendants Arthur E. Lee and Nancy L. Lee ("Defendants"), that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 1, 2020, shall be extended from March 23, 2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/6/2020. (sms, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN on behalf of Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (ld, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion Filed with United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Motion for Transfer, #2 Brief in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Declaration of Priyanka Wityk in Support of the Motion for Transfer, #5 Docket sheets and complaints in the Actions, #6 Proof of Service of the Motion for Transfer)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 30, 2020 Filing 64 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Arthur E. Lee and Nancy L. Lee to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 26, 2020 Filing 63 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Arlene Starr to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff's and Defendant Irene A. Koumendouros ("Defendant"), that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 20. 2020, shall be extended from April 10, 2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/25/2020. (sms)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that the Prudential Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to May 18, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/25/2020. (ld, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (LACK, ROBERT)
March 24, 2020 Filing 60 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Irene A. Koumendouros to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Asset Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, PRIAC Funds (Defendant NJ-3), Prudential Financial, Inc. (The Prudential Insurance Company of America), Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., and Quantitative Management Associates LLC to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants Susan M. McCoy, Jeffrey Brisman, Ninive Giardano, Mark Dezao, and Suzanne Maloney ("Defendants"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be extended from March 18, March 23, March 25, March 30, and April 7, 2020, respectively, to May 18, 2020.,; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/23/2020. (ld, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants Patricia Kenny, Vincent Morales, and Ira Margulies ("Defendants"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be extended from March 23, March 30, and April 1, 2020, respectively, to May 18, 2020.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/23/2020. (ld, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant John DSouza ("Defendant"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be extended from March 23, 2020 to May 18, 2020.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/23/2020. (ld, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 56 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant John D'Souza to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Patricia Kenny, Vincent Morales, and Ira Margulies to Respond to the Complaint, #3 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants Susan M. McCory, Jeffrey Brisman, Ninive Giordano, Mark Dezao, and Suzanne Maloney to Respond to the Complain)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 3, 2020, shall be extended from March 24, 2020 to May 18, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/20/2020. (ld, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 54 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant NJ-4 to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; It is stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant Gerald C. Crotty ("Defendant"), by and their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendant on March 4, 2020, shall be extended from March 25, 2020 to May 18, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/18/2020. (sms)
March 17, 2020 Filing 52 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Gerald C. Crotty to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 17, 2020 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Ninive Giordano served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #43 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Defendant NJ-3, Quantitative Management Associates LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/1/2020. (ld, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's (Charles L. Pickett) time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/16/2020. (ld, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's (Pamela M. Paul) time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/16/2020. (ld, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendant's (Jack Gross) time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18,2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/16/2020. (ld, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MUSCATO on behalf of Gerald C. Crotty (MUSCATO, ANDREW)
March 16, 2020 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. PRIAC FUNDS served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 16, 2020 Filing 45 Letter from Robert J. Lack. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Jack Gross to Respond to the Complaint)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE M. CERRA on behalf of Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC (CERRA, SUZANNE)
March 13, 2020 Filing 43 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (RYAN, KRISTINE)
March 13, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE V. RYAN on behalf of Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant NJ-3, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC (RYAN, KRISTINE)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, which was served upon Defendants on February 26, 2020, shall be extended from March 18, 2020 to May 18, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/13/2020. (ld, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 40 Letter from Robert J. Lack to Judge Clark. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendants John T. McClain and Tami Fersko to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Pamela M. Paul to Respond to the Complain, #3 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Extending Time for Defendant Charles L. Pickett to Respond to the Complain)(LACK, ROBERT)
March 11, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Vincent Morales served on 3/7/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 11, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Gerald C. Crotty served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 11, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Patricia Kenny served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 11, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Nancy L. Lee served on 3/1/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 11, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Arthur E. Lee served on 3/1/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 10, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Arundhati Kulkarni served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 10, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Mark DeZao served on 3/7/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Cynthia DiPietrantonio served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Charles L. Pickett served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Pamela M. Paul served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Arlene Starr served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. John D'Souza served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Jeffrey Brisman served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Tami Fersko served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Susan M. McCoy served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Quantitative Management Associates LLC served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Prudential Financial, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. John T. McClain served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Jack Gross served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner. Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (LACK, ROBERT)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark for all further proceedings. Judge Stanley R. Chesler, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/28/20. (ak, )
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal Document #4 ; that the Plaintiffs Motion to Seal is hereby granted. The unredacted Complaint shall be filed under seal pending further order of this Court. The following materials shall be redacted from the publicly filed version of the Complaint;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/27/2020. (ld, )
February 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Edward A. Friedman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10457208.) (LACK, ROBERT)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/21/2020. (ld, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Robert J. Lack re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Admission of Edward A. Friedman Pro Hac Vice by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Edward A. Friedman re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Admission of Edward A. Friedman Pro Hac Vice by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Admission of Edward A. Friedman Pro Hac Vice by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LACK, ROBERT)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio, Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio, Jeffrey Brisman, Gerald C. Crotty, John D'Souza, Mark DeZao, Defendant NJ-1, Defendant NJ-2, Defendant NJ-3, Defendant NJ-4, Cynthia DiPietrantonio, Tami Fersko, Ninive Giordano, Jack Gross, Alison Hemming, Patricia Kenny, Irene A. Koumendouros, Arundhati Kulkarni, Suzanne Maloney, Ira Margulies, John T. McClain, Susan M. McCoy, Vincent Morales, Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC, PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund, Pamela M. Paul, Charles L. Pickett, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co., Quantitative Management Associates LLC, Arlene Starr. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
February 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, . Motion set for 3/16/2020 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
February 19, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Priyanka Wityk re #5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(LACK, ROBERT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, (LACK, ROBERT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document #4 Exhibit (to Document),, by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LACK, ROBERT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Unredacted Complaint by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying WSFS Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (LACK, ROBERT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Marc S. Kirschner, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (LACK, ROBERT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10430469) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Marc S. Kirschner.(LACK, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirschner et al v. McClain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald C. Crotty
Represented By: ANDREW MUSCATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela M. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Chapters Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PGIM QMA Small-Cap Value Fund
Represented By: SUZANNE M. CERRA
Represented By: KRISTINE V. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D'Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia DiPietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Hemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust Small Cap Value Portfolio
Represented By: SUZANNE M. CERRA
Represented By: KRISTINE V. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Series Trust Academic Strategies Allocation Portfolio
Represented By: SUZANNE M. CERRA
Represented By: KRISTINE V. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark DeZao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninive Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Retirement Insurance & Annuity Co.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. CERRA
Represented By: KRISTINE V. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Financial, Inc.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. CERRA
Represented By: KRISTINE V. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene A. Koumendouros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arundhati Kulkarni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami Fersko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Brisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant NJ-3
Represented By: SUZANNE M. CERRA
Represented By: KRISTINE V. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantitative Management Associates LLC
Represented By: SUZANNE M. CERRA
Represented By: KRISTINE V. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIAC FUNDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc S. Kirschner
Represented By: ROBERT J. LACK
Represented By: EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: ROBERT J. LACK
Represented By: EDWARD A. FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?