HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. ULTIMATE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: ULTIMATE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, VINOD KUMAR and MANOJ KUMAR
Case Number: 2:2020cv02768
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC.. MANOJ KUMAR served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (COUCH, BRYAN)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MANOJ KUMAR, VINOD KUMAR, ULTIMATE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
March 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR on behalf of HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC. (GATTONI, WILLIAM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MANOJ KUMAR, VINOD KUMAR, ULTIMATE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10548025), filed by HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. ULTIMATE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULTIMATE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINOD KUMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANOJ KUMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?