MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V. et al v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V, ORGANON USA INC. and MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and LUPIN INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02786
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
2 Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Initial Pretrial Conference via telephone held on 7/1/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH A GEERS on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. (GEERS, SARAH)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Defendants' Counterclaims by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM) Modified on 6/30/2020 (dam, ).
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 Joint Discovery Plan by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC..(DENI, WILLIAM)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the scheduling conference before the Undersigned on July 1, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. will now proceed via telephone. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in on the conference call. The Participant can dial (*6 ) to Mute. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 6/16/20.(LM, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, JEFFREY)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. by LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, JEFFREY)
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 5/12/20. (LM, )
April 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CATHERINE R. GOURASH, WILLIAM R. ZIMMERMAN, ANDREA L. CHEEK and CAROL PITZEL CRUZ, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Carol Pitzel Cruz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10697071.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrea L. Cheek to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10697060.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William R. Zimmerman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10697044.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Catherine R. Gourash to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10697014.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Letter/Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of WILLIAM R. ZIMMERMAN, ANDREA L. CHEEK, CATHERINE R. GOURASH, and CAROL PITZEL CRUZ. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 4/16/2020. (dam, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Jeffrey A. Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jeffrey A. Cohen, #2 Certification of Andrea L. Cheek, #3 Certification of Carol Pitzel Cruz, #4 Certification of William R. Zimmerman, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, JEFFREY)
April 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. LUPIN INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; LUPIN LIMITED waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (DENI, WILLIAM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. COHEN on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, JEFFREY)
March 17, 2020 Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC. (LOWER, J.)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/16/2020. (jjc, )
March 16, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (gxh)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mg)
March 13, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10549161), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V., ORGANON USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 L. Civ. R. 11.2 & 40.1 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V. et al v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED
Represented By: JEFFREY A. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY A. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY A. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORGANON USA INC.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: SARAH A GEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCK SHARP & DOHME B.V.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: SARAH A GEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?