LIRIANO OLIVO et al v. TSOUKARIS et al
Petitioner: VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ and MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, JOHN TSOUKARIS, GUY CIRILLO, WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, CHAD F. WOLF and WILLIAM P. BARR
Case Number: 2:2020cv03481
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #26 Petitioners' Motion to Seal ECF Nos. 2-1, 2-2, 2-3, 2-4, 2-5, 2-6, 2-7, 2-8, 2-9, 17-8, 17-9, 17-11, 17-12, 17-13, 17-14, 17-15, 17-18; etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/15/2020. (sm)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that the Clerks Office shall separate this action and sever the Petitioners, with a separate docket number for each Petitioner - Victor M.L., Michaell A.G., Rafael L.O., Adrian E. G.G., and Javier S.M. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/14/2020. (sm)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the TRO, D.E. 14, is hereby converted to a preliminary injunction; Petitioners Rafael L.O., Adrian E. G.G., and Javier S.M. remain subject to the conditions of release set forth in the TRO, D.E. 25; if any Petitioner (Petitioners Rafael L.O., Adrian E. G.G., and Javier S.M.) should violate any of the conditions of release, or be charged with a criminal offense, then U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) may take whatever lawful action that it deems necessary without first seeking leave from the Court. ICE shall notify Petitioners counsel of such action as soon thereafter as is practicable. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/14/2020. (sm)
May 14, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2020 by telephone conferencing re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 37 Letter from Petitioners re #36 Letter. (CASTLE, BRITTANY)
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 Letter from the respondents opposing the entry of a preliminary injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Director Ortiz, dated May 11, 2020, #2 Declaration of Dr. Anicetti, dated May 4, 2020)(DHARIA, KRUTI)
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 BRIEF Reply Brief In Support of Preliminary Injunction (CASTLE, BRITTANY)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #33 Letter for Unopposed Request for Acceptance of Late Filing. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/7/2020. (bt, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 33 Letter from Petitioner Regarding Unopposed Request for Acceptance of Late Filing re #32 Exhibit Index,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Matthew A. Johnson in Support of Unopposed Request for Acceptance of Late Filing, #2 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
May 5, 2020 Filing 32 Exhibit Index to Re #31 Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Emails from Essex County Chief of Staff Philip B. Alagia, #2 Exhibit B: Press Release, Essex County Executive Divicenzo, Freeholder President Gill and Vice President Richardson Comment Medical Care Provider on Initiative to Screen All Essex County Correctional Facility Inmates and Detainees for COVID-19., #3 Exhibit C: Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Jaimie Meyer, M.D., M.S., D-A-A- v. Decker, Case No. 20-cv-4337 (D.N.J. Apr. 22, 2020), #4 Exhibit D: Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Elizabeth Singer, #5 Exhibit E: Supplemental Declaration of Rosa Santana, First Friends of New York and New Jersey, #6 Exhibit F: Jason W. v. Anderson, 2:20-cv-3704 (D.N.J. Apr. 17, 2020), #7 Exhibit G: Christian A.R. v. Decker, 2020 WL 2092616 (D.N.J. Apr. 12, 2020), #8 Exhibit H: Durel B. v. Decker, 2020 WL 1922140 (D.N.J. Apr. 21, 2020), #9 Exhibit I: Jeferson V.G. v. Decker, 2020 WL 1873018 (D.N.J. Apr. 15, 2020), #10 Exhibit J: Leandro R.P. v. Decker, 2020 WL 1899791 (D.N.J. Apr. 17, 2020), #11 Exhibit K: Preliminary Injunction Grant, Kevin M.A. v. Decker, 2020 WL 2092791, (D.N.J. May 1, 2020), #12 Exhibit L: Fourth Amended Declaration of Alfaro Ortiz, Cleland v. Tsoukaris, Case No. 2:20-cv-04622 (D.N.J. Apr. 42, 2020) ECF 7-5, #13 Exhibit M: Opinion and Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, Basank v. Decker, 2020 WL 1953847 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 23, 2020), #14 Exhibit N: Opinion and Order Converting Temporary Restraining Order into Preliminary Injunction, Malam v. Adducci, 2020 WL 1899570 (E.D. Mich. Apr. 17, 2020), #15 Exhibit O: Valenzuela Arias v. Decker, 2020 WL 1847986 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 10, 2020), #16 Exhibit P: Opinion and Order Converting Temporary Restraining Order into Preliminary Injunction, Malam v. Adducci, 2020 WL 1934895 (E.D. Mich. Apr. 22, 2020), #17 Exhibit Q: Ferreyra v. Decker, No. 1:20-cv-3170, 2020 WL 1989417 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 27, 2020), #18 Exhibit R: Supplemental Declaration of Olivia Kaplan, #19 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
May 4, 2020 Filing 31 BRIEF in Support of Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
May 4, 2020 Filing 30 Letter from the respondents regarding preliminary injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Director Ortiz, dated May 4, 2020)(DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 29, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c). Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the TRO, D.E. 25, granted on April 9, 2020, is extended until May 14, 2020; that on May 14, 2020, at 3:00 p.m., the Court will hear oral argument from the parties as to whether the TRO should be converted to a preliminary injunction; the parties shall submit briefs as to the preliminary injunction by May 4, 2020, and either side may file opposition by May 11, 2020. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/24/2020. (sm)
April 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number TRE111017 as to Lauren Major, Esq and Anna Byers, Esq. (jjc, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Hearing held on 4/23/2020 regarding the pending emergent application. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by BRITTANY CARYL CASTLE on behalf of MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ (CASTLE, BRITTANY)
April 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Leila Kang, Esq.: $ 150, receipt number CAM011237 (tf, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c) by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Leila Kang, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that motion of Petitioners Victor M.L. and Michaell A.G. (D.E. 5) is DENIED without prejudice as moot because they have already been released; the motion of the remaining Petitioners Rafael L.O., Adrian E. G.G., and Javier S.M. - for a temporary restraining order D.E. 5, is GRANTED; that remaining Petitioners are to be released subject to the following specific conditions; etc.; the Court will hear argument as to whether the TRO should be convertedto a preliminary injunction on April 23, 2020, at 2 p.m. by teleconference; etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/9/2020. (sm)
April 9, 2020 Filing 24 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/9/2020. (sm)
April 8, 2020 Filing 23 Letter from Matthew Johnson re #22 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Letter from Rayza Goldsmith, Esq.)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 22 Letter from the Government. (DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2020 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from Matthew Johnson re #17 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Release Documents from Criminal Arrest of Petitioner Santiago Martinez, #2 Exhibit B, Parole Documents for Petitioner Liriano Olivo, #3 Exhibit C, Memorandum and Order, Hope v. Doll (M.D.Pa. Apr. 7, 2020))(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 Exhibit Index to Re #5 Motion for TRO,,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Motion for Order to Show Cause,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 Exhibit Index to Re #5 Motion for TRO,,, Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Motion for Order to Show Cause,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JOHN TSOUKARIS, CHAD F. WOLF re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Director Ortiz, #2 Exhibit A (Interim guidance of Management of COVID-19), #3 Exhibit B (ICE Memo on COVID-19), #4 Exhibit C (Olivo NTA), #5 Exhibit D (Olivo Judgment of Conviction), #6 Exhibit E (Olivo Form I-213), #7 Exhibit F (Martinez NTA), #8 Exhibit G (Martinez Form I-213), #9 Exhibit H (Martinez Criminal Complaint), #10 Exhibit I (Martinez Request of Bond Withdrawal), #11 Exhibit J (Martinez Denial of Release), #12 Exhibit K (Garza NTA), #13 Exhibit L (Garza Form I-213), #14 Exhibit M (Garza Bond Order), #15 Exhibit N (BIA's rejection of Garza's appeal), #16 Exhibit O (Francisco M. v. Decker), #17 Exhibit P (Lateef v. Decker), #18 Exhibit Q (Garza Denial of Release), #19 Exhibit R (Olivo Denial of Release))(DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna Byers, Esq., etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/6/2020. (th, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Major, Esq., etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/6/2020. (th, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leila Kang, Esq., etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/6/2020. (th, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court is Petitioners motion for temporary restraints. D.E. 5. As discussed during the telephone conference with counsel on April 3, 2020, Respondents shall submit any opposition by April 6, 2020. Petitioners are also granted leave to file supplemental information in support of their motion by April 6. The Court will hear argument on the motion, by teleconference, on April 7, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/3/2020. (ro, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status phone conference held on 4/3/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from AUSA Stinson with Declaration regarding ECCF. (STINSON, JOHN)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by KRUTI D. DHARIA on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM P. BARR, GUY CIRILLO, JOHN TSOUKARIS, CHAD F. WOLF (DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Anna Byers) by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anna Byers in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Matthew Johnson in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lauren Major) by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Major in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Matthew Johnson in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Leila Kang) by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leila Kang in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Matthew Johnson in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lauren Major), #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Leila Kang), #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Anna Byers). Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
April 3, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declarations of Leila Kang, Lauren Major, and Anna Byers contained in the Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (D.E #7 , D.E #8 , D.E #9 ) submitted by Matthew Johnson on 4/3/2020 contain improper signatures. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling a telephone conference for April 3, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. regarding the pending application for temporary restraining order. The court shall provide counsel with dial-in information. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/2/2020. (ro, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Order to Show Cause by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Immediate Release Pursuant to Lucas v. Hadden, and/or Order to Show Cause, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN TUDOR STINSON, JR on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM P. BARR, GUY CIRILLO, JOHN TSOUKARIS, CHAD F. WOLF (STINSON, JOHN)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN TUDOR STINSON, JR on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, WILLIAM P. BARR, GUY CIRILLO, JOHN TSOUKARIS, CHAD F. WOLF (STINSON, JOHN)
April 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez. (jr)
April 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Notice of Appearance filed by John Stinson on 4/2/2020 contains the incorrect case number. Please resubmit the Notice of Appearance. (qa, )
April 2, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,,, (Exhibits A, B, D, E, G, H, I, J, L filed under temporary seal pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.3(c)) by MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, ADRRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Medical Records of Rafael Liriano Olivio, #2 Exhibit B: Letter from Dr. Carol L. Kessler, #3 Exhibit D: Medical Records of Adrian Gonzalez Garza, #4 Exhibit E: Declaration of Dr. Raman Nohria, #5 Exhibit G: Medical Records of Victor Medina Lopez, #6 Exhibit H: Letter from Dr. Peggy Leung, #7 Exhibit I: Medical Records of Michaell Acosta Granados, #8 Exhibit J: Letter of Dr. Farnaz Farhi, et al., #9 Exhibit L: Medical Records of Javier Santiago Martinez, #10 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-10631730.), filed by VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ, ADRRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA, MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS, RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO, JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Matthew Johnson, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration of Ilana Herr, #4 Exhibit F: Declaration of Joelle Lingat, #5 Exhibit K: Declaration of Anna Byers, #6 Exhibit M: Declaration of Dr. Allen Keller, #7 Exhibit N: Declaration of Jordan Weiner, #8 Exhibit O: Declaration of Dr. Elizabeth Singer, #9 Exhibit P: Declaration of Rosa Santana, #10 Exhibit Q: Letter to Newark ICE Field Office, #11 Exhibit R: Emails from Essex County Chief of Staff Philip B. Alagia, #12 Exhibit S: Email from EOIR, #13 Exhibit T: Declaration of Dr. Ranit Mishori, #14 Exhibit U: Letter to Members of Congress, #15 Exhibit V: Declaration of Dr. Jamie Meyer, #16 Exhibit W: Declaration of Dora Schriro, #17 Exhibit X: Order in Coronel v. Decker, No. 20-cv-2472 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 27, 2020), #18 Exhibit Y: Order in Basank v. Decker, 20 Civ. 2518 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 26, 2020), #19 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIRIANO OLIVO et al v. TSOUKARIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: John T. Stinson, Jr
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: John T. Stinson, Jr
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GUY CIRILLO
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: John T. Stinson, Jr
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: John T. Stinson, Jr
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: John T. Stinson, Jr
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: John T. Stinson, Jr
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VICTOR MEDINA LOPEZ
Represented By: MATTHEW ANTHONY JOHNSON
Represented By: BRITTANY CASTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAFAEL LIRIANO OLIVO
Represented By: MATTHEW ANTHONY JOHNSON
Represented By: BRITTANY CASTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ADRIAN ENRIQUE GONZALEZ GARZA
Represented By: MATTHEW ANTHONY JOHNSON
Represented By: BRITTANY CASTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAVIER SANTIAGO MARTINEZ
Represented By: MATTHEW ANTHONY JOHNSON
Represented By: BRITTANY CASTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAELL ACOSTA GRANADOS
Represented By: MATTHEW ANTHONY JOHNSON
Represented By: BRITTANY CASTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?