CUA SOC v. ANDERSON, et al.
Petitioner: EMERSON ODIR CUA SOC
Respondent: Secretary Chad Wolf, Jail ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, Director Ronaldo Donato Vitiello, Field Office Directo John Tsoukaris, Warden William Anderson, ICE DHS U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ICE Enforcement & Removal Operations, ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, CHAD WOLF, JOHN TSOUKARIS, RONALD DONATO VITIELLO and WILLIAM ANDERSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv03774
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED without Prejudice; Petitioner's request for immediate release is DENIED without Prejudice. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED*** Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/22/2020. (ams, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 13 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/22/2020. (ams, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from the respondents regarding Petitioner's April 16 and 17 submissions. (DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit from Petitioner, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LESCHAK, JOHN)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Petitioner RE: Habeas Corpus Petition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LESCHAK, JOHN)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from the respondents.. (DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Hearing held on 4/15/2020 regarding the pending emergent application for release. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response re #6 Response to Habeas Petition,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LESCHAK, JOHN)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILLIAM ANDERSON, ICE ENFORCEMENT & REMOVAL OPERATIONS, JOHN TSOUKARIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD DONATO VITIELLO, CHAD WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Director Ortiz, #2 Exhibit 1 (Interim guidance of Management of COVID-19), #3 Exhibit 2 (ICE Memo on COVID-19), #4 Exhibit 3 (UPDATED COVID-19 Guidance, #5 Exhibit 4 (Francisco M. Order), #6 Exhibit 5 (Order denying dismissal of indictment), #7 Exhibit 6 (ICE Enforcement and Removal Operations COVID-19 Pandemic Response))(DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Opposition to the pending application for emergent relief is due by April 14,2020. Oral argument will be held on April 15, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. by telephone conferencing. Counsel are to utilize the dial-in instructions the court has provided for this call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/9/2020. (ro, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status telephone conference held on 4/9/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KRUTI D. DHARIA on behalf of William Anderson, ICE Enforcement & Removal Operations, John Tsoukaris, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, Ronaldo Donato Vitiello, Chad Wolf (DHARIA, KRUTI)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling a telephone conference for April 8, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. regarding the pending emergent application. Petitioner's counsel shall notify Respondents of this scheduled conference. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in information. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/8/2020. (ro, )
April 8, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez added. (ps, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief pursuant to 28 USC 2241 ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-10654981.), filed by EMERSON ODIR CUA SOC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit Exhibit J)(LESCHAK, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUA SOC v. ANDERSON, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jail ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Ronaldo Donato Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Directo John Tsoukaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden William Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE DHS U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE Enforcement & Removal Operations
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD DONATO VITIELLO
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM ANDERSON
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EMERSON ODIR CUA SOC
Represented By: John Peter Leschak
Represented By: JOHN P. LESCHAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?