OMEGA MATERIALS ALLIANCE, LLC v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: OMEGA MATERIALS ALLIANCE, LLC
Defendant: H&S CONSTRUCTION & MECHANICAL, INC.,, U.S. DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HOPES COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP, INC., T.D. BANK, N.A., XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2020cv03882
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (WILSON, JEFFREY)
June 3, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 submitted by U.S. DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/15/2020. (sm)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney ALEX D. SILAGI for U.S. DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES,ALEX D. SILAGI for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added. (SILAGI, ALEX)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL A. SANDARS, III on behalf of HOPES COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP, INC. (SANDARS, PAUL)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 6/26/2020. Defendant will kindly provide a copy of this notice to the plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/17/2020. (jqb, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (MANDAL, PAUL)
April 10, 2020 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, LAW DIVISION, HUDSON COUNTY, case number HUD-L-000754-20., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to D of Notice of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SILAGI, ALEX)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OMEGA MATERIALS ALLIANCE, LLC v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&S CONSTRUCTION & MECHANICAL, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEP'T OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Represented By: ALEX D. SILAGI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ALEX D. SILAGI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOPES COMMUNITY ACTION PARTNERSHIP, INC.
Represented By: PAUL A. SANDARS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMEGA MATERIALS ALLIANCE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?