DOMINGUEZ-MARTINEZ v. BARR et al
Petitioner: JOSE ROBERTO DOMINGUEZ-MARTINEZ
Respondent: CHAD WOLF, ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, JOHN TSOURAKIS and WILLIAM BARR
Case Number: 2:2020cv04031
Filed: April 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (DE 1), is DENIED without prejudice; that the Clerk shall mark this case as closed. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/24/2020. (sm)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/24/2020. (sm)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KIM, DAVID)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney DAVID KIM for MATTHEW T. ALBENCE,DAVID KIM for WILLIAM BARR,DAVID KIM for ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ,DAVID KIM for JOHN TSOURAKIS,DAVID KIM for CHAD WOLF added.. (KIM, DAVID)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall serve copies of the petition (DE 1) and this order upon respondents by regular mail, with all costs of service advanced by the United States; the Clerk shall forward a copy of the petition (DE 1) and this order to the Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorneys Office, at the following email address: USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov; within two (2) days of the entry of this order, respondents shall file and serve an answer; within seven (7) days of petitioners release, by parole or otherwise, as well as any change in the basis for petitioners immigration detention, respondents shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk; the Clerk shall serve a copy of this order upon Petitioners counsel electronically.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/13/2020. (sm)
April 13, 2020 Judge Kevin McNulty added. (ps, )
April 12, 2020 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-10671373.), filed by Jose Roberto Dominguez-Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-044 Civil Cover Letter - Timothy Shea, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Application IFP Habeas Petition Form AO 242, #4 Brief Babeas Petition Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause, #6 Text of Proposed Order Habeas Order)(SHEA, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOMINGUEZ-MARTINEZ v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD WOLF
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: DAVID KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: DAVID KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: DAVID KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOURAKIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: DAVID KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: DAVID KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE ROBERTO DOMINGUEZ-MARTINEZ
Represented By: TIMOTHY J SHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?