DIRAUF et al v. BERGER et al
Plaintiff: ANNY HANISCH, WALTER SCHMIDT, LUDWIG DIRAUF, ALFONS ECKL (DECEASED), THOMAS GEBERT, KAREN FLAIG, HILDEGARD STROBEL, HELGA HAAG, GABRIELE REICHEL, WERNER NEFF, ANTON HELL, ALFRED HERRMANN, INGRID SCHOTT, FRIEDRICH SCHUMANN, ERIKA MARQUARDT, GEORG WEYBRECHT, EUGEN WOLZ, WALTER HORBER, HANS STEIN, KUNLGUNDA DIRAUF, DANIEL GEBERT, VOLODYMYR KOLTYAROV, KARL WECKERT, DIETER VOGT, INGRID SCHOTT (AS SUCCESSOR TO HERMANN SCHOTT), GUDRUN SCHUMANN, DORIS FABIAN, ALEXANDER FISCHER, EDWIN SCHOTT, MONIKA GERBERT, GERHARD FLAIG, DANIEL NEFF, ANDREAS LOBER, KARL STAHL, BRUNO ECKL, ERWIN PFEIFROTH, FRIEDRICH STROBEL, CHRISTIAN STROBEL, HILDEGARD ECKL, MELANIE SCHROTH, MANFRED MARQUARDT, TIMO STROBEL, CHRISTINA KLENK, MARTIN HAAG, MARLIESE NEFF, WALTRAUD SCHMIDT, HERMANN KLENK (DECEASED), IRENE HERRMANN, DOBERNEK RAINER, FRITZ GEBERT, KARIN FLAIG, MONIKA GEBERT and GUNTHER FABIAN
Defendant: MACARTHUR PLAZA, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, INDUSTRIAL AVENUE INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, CARLSTADT BUILDING ASSOCIATES, UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES LP, ROUTE 206 SHOPPING CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, BRANCHBURG PLAZA INVESTORS LP, KING SHOPPING CENTER LP, BERGER AND BORNSTEIN LLC, WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INC., LAWRENCE S. BERGER, 18 CENTRAL SHOPPING CENTER, L.P., EXPRESS DISTRIBUTION BUILDING, NEW MILIK STREET PROPERTY LP, UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC., WATERFORD INVESTORS LP, WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, MILIK STREET ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, USLR NEW DURHAM ROAD ASSOCIATES, L.P., UNION SHOPPING PLAZA ASSOCIATES, L.P., BANK BUILDING ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, SUCCESS THEUHANDGESELLSCHAFT GMBH, ECKART R. STRAUB, HAZELWOOD AVENUE ASSOCIATES, 299 JEFFERSON ROAD LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, BLAIR ROAD ASSOCIATES LP, CARLSTADT BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P, HAZELWOOD AVENUE ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, BERGER AND BORNSTEIN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY and EXPRESS DISTRIBUTION BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P
Case Number: 2:2020cv05601
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ECKART R. STRAUB, SUCCESS THEUHANDGESELLSCHAFT GMBH re #12 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order (Attachments: #1 Certification of Elliot D. Ostrove, #2 Certificate of Service)(OSTROVE, ELLIOT)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order (PEKERMAN, VICTORIA)
May 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Vacate #10 Order by ECKART R. STRAUB, SUCCESS THEUHANDGESELLSCHAFT GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(OSTROVE, ELLIOT)
May 13, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Morris County CourthouseWashington & Court StreetsMorristown, NJ 07963-0910 State No: MRS-L-01953-19. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (sm)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this action is REMANDED to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Morris County, Docket No. MRS-L-001953-19; the clerk shall close the file in the federal case. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/13/2020. (sm)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Victoria R. Pekerman, Esq. to Judge McNulty and Magistrate Judge Kiel. (PEKERMAN, VICTORIA)
May 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ECKART R. STRAUB, SUCCESS THEUHANDGESELLSCHAFT GMBH. Responses due by 6/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(OSTROVE, ELLIOT)
May 12, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by 18 CENTRAL SHOPPING CENTER, L.P., 299 JEFFERSON ROAD LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, BANK BUILDING ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, LAWRENCE S. BERGER, BERGER AND BORNSTEIN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BLAIR ROAD ASSOCIATES LP, BRANCHBURG PLAZA INVESTORS LP, CARLSTADT BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P, EXPRESS DISTRIBUTION BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P, INDUSTRIAL AVENUE INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, KING SHOPPING CENTER LP, MACARTHUR PLAZA, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, MILIK STREET ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NEW MILIK STREET PROPERTY LP, ROUTE 206 SHOPPING CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, UNION SHOPPING PLAZA ASSOCIATES, L.P., UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES LP, UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC., USLR NEW DURHAM ROAD ASSOCIATES, L.P., WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INC., WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, WATERFORD INVESTORS LP. Responses due by 6/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Discontinuance (PEKERMAN, VICTORIA)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on June 11, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/11/2020. (as, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from William J. Pinilis. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. PINILIS on behalf of 18 CENTRAL SHOPPING CENTER, L.P., 299 JEFFERSON ROAD LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, BANK BUILDING ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, LAWRENCE S. BERGER, BERGER AND BORNSTEIN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BLAIR ROAD ASSOCIATES LP, BRANCHBURG PLAZA INVESTORS LP, CARLSTADT BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P, EXPRESS DISTRIBUTION BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P, HAZELWOOD AVENUE ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, INDUSTRIAL AVENUE INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, KING SHOPPING CENTER LP, MACARTHUR PLAZA, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, MILIK STREET ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, NEW MILIK STREET PROPERTY LP, ROUTE 206 SHOPPING CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, UNION SHOPPING PLAZA ASSOCIATES, L.P., UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES LP, UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC., USLR NEW DURHAM ROAD ASSOCIATES, L.P., WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INC., WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, WATERFORD INVESTORS LP (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
May 6, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by VAHBIZ P. KARANJIA on behalf of ECKART R. STRAUB (KARANJIA, VAHBIZ)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ECKART R. STRAUB from Superior Court of New Jersey, Morris County, Law Division, case number MRS-L-001953-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10779173), filed by ECKART R. STRAUB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Co-Defendants' Consent to Removal, #2 Exhibit "B" - Part 1 of 2 of State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit "B" - Part 2 of 2 of State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit "C" - Notice to Superior Court of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)(OSTROVE, ELLIOT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIRAUF et al v. BERGER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNY HANISCH
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER SCHMIDT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUDWIG DIRAUF
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFONS ECKL (DECEASED)
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS GEBERT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN FLAIG
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILDEGARD STROBEL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELGA HAAG
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIELE REICHEL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WERNER NEFF
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTON HELL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED HERRMANN
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGRID SCHOTT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIEDRICH SCHUMANN
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIKA MARQUARDT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORG WEYBRECHT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGEN WOLZ
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER HORBER
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANS STEIN
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KUNLGUNDA DIRAUF
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL GEBERT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VOLODYMYR KOLTYAROV
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL WECKERT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIETER VOGT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGRID SCHOTT (AS SUCCESSOR TO HERMANN SCHOTT)
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUDRUN SCHUMANN
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIS FABIAN
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER FISCHER
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN SCHOTT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIKA GERBERT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERHARD FLAIG
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL NEFF
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREAS LOBER
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL STAHL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUNO ECKL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERWIN PFEIFROTH
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIEDRICH STROBEL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN STROBEL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILDEGARD ECKL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE SCHROTH
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANFRED MARQUARDT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMO STROBEL
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA KLENK
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN HAAG
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLIESE NEFF
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTRAUD SCHMIDT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERMANN KLENK (DECEASED)
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE HERRMANN
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOBERNEK RAINER
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRITZ GEBERT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARIN FLAIG
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIKA GEBERT
Represented By: VICTORIA R. PEKERMAN
Represented By: DAVID OWEN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUNTHER FABIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACARTHUR PLAZA, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL AVENUE INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLSTADT BUILDING ASSOCIATES
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES LAND RESOURCES LP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROUTE 206 SHOPPING CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANCHBURG PLAZA INVESTORS LP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KING SHOPPING CENTER LP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGER AND BORNSTEIN LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE S. BERGER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 CENTRAL SHOPPING CENTER, L.P.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS DISTRIBUTION BUILDING
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW MILIK STREET PROPERTY LP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES REALTY RESOURCES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATERFORD INVESTORS LP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILIK STREET ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USLR NEW DURHAM ROAD ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION SHOPPING PLAZA ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK BUILDING ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUCCESS THEUHANDGESELLSCHAFT GMBH
Represented By: ELLIOT DAVID OSTROVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECKART R. STRAUB
Represented By: VAHBIZ P. KARANJIA
Represented By: ELLIOT DAVID OSTROVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAZELWOOD AVENUE ASSOCIATES
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 299 JEFFERSON ROAD LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAIR ROAD ASSOCIATES LP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLSTADT BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAZELWOOD AVENUE ASSOCIATES, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGER AND BORNSTEIN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS DISTRIBUTION BUILDING ASSOCIATES, L.P
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?