FARRELL v. TSOUKARIS et al
Petitioner: KADEEM CHRIS FARRELL and KADEEM C FARRELL
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF, GUY CIRILLO, JOHN TSOUKARIS, MR., WILLIAM J. ANDERSON and JOHN TSOUKARIS
Case Number: 2:2020cv06491
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit to #4 Response to Habeas Petition Ex. 10 (ICE Medical Records) [UNDER SEAL] by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO. (KIM, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WILLIAM J. ANDERSON, GUY CIRILLO.(KIM, DAVID)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID KIM on behalf of All Defendants (KIM, DAVID)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that this Court has examined the Petition and determined that dismissal prior to submission of an answer and the record is not warranted; Respondents Tsoukaris and Wolf are dismissed with prejudice as the sole proper respondent in a petition brought under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is the warden of the facility where the detainee is currently being held, in this case remaining Respondents Anderson and Cirillo; the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition #1 and this Order, upon Respondents Anderson and Cirillo; the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition, and this Order, to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorneys Office, at the following email address: USANJHabeasCases@usdoj.gov; within ten (10) days of the date of entry of this Order, Respondents shall electronically file a full and complete answer to said Petition; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Petition within seven (7) days after the answer is filed; within seven (7) days after any change in Petitioners custody or immigration status, be it release, a final order of removal, or otherwise, Respondents shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk of the Court; and that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Petitioner electronically. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/1/2020. (sm)
May 29, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi. (jr)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus COVID-19 ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-10869202.), filed by KADEEM C FARRELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARRELL v. TSOUKARIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GUY CIRILLO
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: DAVID KIM
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS, MR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM J. ANDERSON
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: DAVID KIM
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KADEEM CHRIS FARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KADEEM C FARRELL
Represented By: ROBERT JOHN MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?