SOBERANO ERAZO v. RODRIGUEZ et al
Petitioner: SERGIO DE JESUS SOBERANO ERAZO
Respondent: ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Case Number: 2:2020cv06751
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Petitioner's Counsel re #13 Letter. (GROTAS, PAUL)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Status Update. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
July 8, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Paul Grotas: $ 150, receipt number NEW043032 (sm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL GROTAS on behalf of SERGIO DE JESUS SOBERANO ERAZO (GROTAS, PAUL)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by SERGIO DE JESUS SOBERANO ERAZO. (GROTAS, PAUL)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF In Opposition to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeking A Stay of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Removal Records, #2 Exhibit B, Reinstatement of Removal Order, #3 Exhibit C, Syed T. v. William P. Barr, 2:19-cv-07872-ES, Oral Opinion)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul Grotas; shall pay the annual fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; shall make a payment of $150.00, payable to the Clerk, UnitedStates District Court; etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/4/2020. (sm)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Petitioner's Counsel Re: Non-Opposition to Pro Hac Vice Motion re #7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (MAKABI, PERHAM)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SERGIO DE JESUS SOBERANO ERAZO. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MAKABI, PERHAM)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: By close of business today, June 3, 2020 attorney Paul Grotas, Esq. shall formally file his appearance on this court's docket, and if appropriate move to be admitted pro hac vice. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/3/2020. (ro, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone conference held today, June 3, 2020, Respondent shall file its response to the pending emergent application by June 15, 2020. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/3/2020. (ro, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Hearing held by telephone conferencing on 6/3/2020. regarding the pending emergent application (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling at telephone conference for June 3, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel will be provide dial-in information by the court. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/2/2020. (ro, )
June 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez. (jr)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Sergio De Jesus SOBERANO ERAZO. (MAKABI, PERHAM)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-10888946.), filed by Sergio De Jesus SOBERANO ERAZO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(MAKABI, PERHAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOBERANO ERAZO v. RODRIGUEZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SERGIO DE JESUS SOBERANO ERAZO
Represented By: PERHAM MAKABI
Represented By: PAUL GROTAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?