HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, HAMBURG et al v. B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD.
Plaintiff: HAPAG LLOYD AG and HAPAG LLOYD (AMERICA) LLC
Defendant: B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06784
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to B&C Luxury Auto Ltd. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (lag, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Default by HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA), LLC,, HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, HAMBURG against B&C Luxury Auto Ltd.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, HAMBURG, HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA), LLC,. B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD. served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, HAMBURG, HAPAG-LLOYD (AMERICA), LLC, as to B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 3, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
June 3, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint by HAPAG LLOYD (AMERICA) LLC, HAPAG LLOYD AG. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAPAG LLOYD (AMERICA) LLC, HAPAG LLOYD AG identifying HAPAG LLOYD AG as Corporate Parent.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10893326), filed by HAPAG LLOYD AG, HAPAG LLOYD (AMERICA) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINBERG, RICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAPAG-LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, HAMBURG et al v. B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAPAG LLOYD AG
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAPAG LLOYD (AMERICA) LLC
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&C LUXURY AUTO LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?