RONALD G. FRANK, M.D., P.C. v. HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: RONALD G. FRANK, M.D., P.C.
Defendant: HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. and HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. doing business as HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 2:2020cv06845
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 7/7/2020. (lag, )
July 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RONALD G. FRANK, M.D., P.C. (NAGEL, BRUCE)
June 25, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/9/2020. (lag, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. d/b/a Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey. Attorney DAVID JAY for HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. added. (JAY, DAVID)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID JAY on behalf of HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. (JAY, DAVID)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDEE M. MATLOFF on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MATLOFF, RANDEE)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. d/b/a HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10900879) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RONALD G, M.D., P.C. FRANK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NAGEL, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RONALD G. FRANK, M.D., P.C. v. HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. doing business as HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: DAVID JAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD G. FRANK, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: BRUCE HELLER NAGEL
Represented By: RANDEE M. MATLOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?