HULL et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD HULL and VALERIE HULL
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-20, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. and ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07079
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas G. McIntosh, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/31/20. (jc, )
July 31, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification and Application of Thomas G. McIntosh, filed as an attachment to the #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice submitted by Paul Cosgrove on 7/30/20, contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Certification and Application only using the event Exhibit (to Document) and link back to the motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
July 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul J. Cosgrove, #2 Certification and Application of Thomas G. McIntosh, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(COSGROVE, PAUL)
July 28, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 8(A), 9(B), AND 12(B)(6) of Janssen Research & Development, LLC and Janssen Ortho LLC's Joint Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BLOCK, JEROME)
July 27, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Elmiron Trademark Search))(COSGROVE, PAUL)
July 27, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (COSGROVE, PAUL)
July 23, 2020 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 Letter re #19 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 8(A), 9(B), AND 12(B)(6). (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rachel L. Shkolnik, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/17/20. (jc, )
July 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EDWARD HULL, VALERIE HULL. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Hunter J. Shkolnik in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Rachel L. Shkolnik, #2 Certification APPLICATION AND CERTIFICATION OF TRACIE J. RENFROE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION, #3 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT RACHEL L. SHKOLNIK, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE, #4 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
July 16, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teva SEC Filing, #2 Exhibit NJ Biz, #3 Exhibit The Reporter Online, #4 Exhibit Business Facilities, #5 Exhibit Parsippany Focus, #6 Exhibit Fierce Pharma, #7 Certificate of Service Of Plaintiffs' Response to Teva's Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits 1-6)(BLOCK, JEROME)
July 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #24 Response in Opposition filed by Jerome H. Block on 7/15/20 was submitted incorrectly as an Affidavit. PLEASE RESUBMIT the document using the event Brief in Opposition to Motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Teva SEC Filing, #2 Exhibit NJ Biz, #3 Exhibit The Reporter Online, #4 Exhibit Business Facilities, #5 Exhibit Parsippany Focus, #6 Exhibit Fierce Pharma, #7 Certificate of Service Of Plaintiffs' Response to Teva's Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits 1-6)(BLOCK, JEROME)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Summons to be Issued by EDWARD HULL, VALERIE HULL as to ABC CORPORATIONS 1-20, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
July 15, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #18 Notice of Appearance submitted by Moshe Maimon on 7/14/20 appears to have law firm and address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please go to www.pacer.gov (Manage My Account) to update your information. (jc, )
July 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 8(A), 9(B), AND 12(B)(6). Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 8(A), 9(B), AND 12(B)(6) by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by MOSHE MAIMON on behalf of EDWARD HULL, VALERIE HULL (MAIMON, MOSHE)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Emily T. Acosta, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/13/20. (jc, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Bruce Hurley, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/13/20. (jc, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tracie J. Renfroe, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/13/20. (jc, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kristen Fournier, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/13/20. (jc, )
July 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Counsel for Plaintiffs Unopposed)(BLOCK, JEROME)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification Jerome H. Block, Esq., #2 Certification Emily T. Acosta, Esq., #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Missouri, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Georgia, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Illinois, #6 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Counsel for Plaintiffs, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Electronic Filing and Email to All Counsel of Record)(BLOCK, JEROME)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JEROME H. BLOCK on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BLOCK, JEROME)
July 8, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 8/13/20 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/7/20. (tjg, )
July 7, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice TRACIE J. RENFROE, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice KRISTEN FOURNIER. Motions set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Responses due by 7/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COSGROVE, PAUL)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification OF MICHAEL C. ZOGBY, #2 Certification OF R. BRUCE HURLEY, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice TRACIE J. RENFROE by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification OF MICHAEL C. ZOGBY, #2 Certification OF TRACIE J. RENFROE, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice KRISTEN FOURNIER by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification OF MICHAEL C. ZOGBY,, #2 Certification OF KRISTEN FOURNIER, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 24, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC and JANSSEN ORTHO LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date for JANSSEN ORTHO LLC has been set for 7/14/20. The answer due date for JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC has been set for 7/15/20. Please note these dates are different than what was requested since Defendants have 21 days, not 30 days, to answer or otherwise respond under Rule 81(c)(2)(C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (jc, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Rule 6.1. Attorney MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY for JANSSEN ORTHO LLC,MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY for JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC added. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK on behalf of EDWARD HULL, VALERIE HULL (SHKOLNIK, HUNTER)
June 12, 2020 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps, )
June 12, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption (must match state court case). The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B = Consent of Janssen Ortho LLC)(COSGROVE, PAUL)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-003646-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10925593), filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Consent of Janssen Ortho LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(COSGROVE, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HULL et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: PAUL JOSEPH COSGROVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.
Represented By: PAUL JOSEPH COSGROVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC.
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD HULL
Represented By: MOSHE MAIMON
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEROME H. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE HULL
Represented By: MOSHE MAIMON
Represented By: HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK
Represented By: JEROME H. BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?