DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC v. SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC
Defendant: SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07226
Filed: June 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL A. KENT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel A. Kent to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
June 25, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number CAM011458 for Daniel A. Kent (rtm, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DANIEL A. KENT. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/17/2020. (dam, )
June 17, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel A. Kent. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel A. Kent by DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stamatios Stamoulis, #2 Declaration of Daniel A. Kent, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
June 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Declaration at 7-2) submitted by S. STAMOULIS on 6/15/2020 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel A. Kent by DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stamatios Stamoulis, #2 Declaration of Daniel A. Kent, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (dam, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
June 14, 2020 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps, )
June 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
June 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC identifying Brainbox Innovations, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
June 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC as to SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
June 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10939533) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC v. SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIGIMEDIA TECH, LLC
Represented By: STAMATIOS STAMOULIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?