LASSITER-COVINGTON et al v. TOWNSHIP OF HILLSIDE et al
Plaintiff: NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, AS ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF JERMAINE COVINGTON, NIJEE COVINGTON, A MINOR BY HIS GUARDIAN NYISHA LASSITER COVINGTON, NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, INDIVIDUALLY, N.C and NYISHA LASSITER COVINGTON
Defendant: UNDERSHERIFF DENNIS BURKE, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, JOHN DOES #11-12 (AS YET UNIDENTIFIED UNION TOWNSHIP OFFICIALS OR OFFICERS), SHERIFF OFFICER OGRADY, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, DETECTIVE YOUNG, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, LIEUTENANT QIANA BROWN, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, OFFICER KRYSTI JANUSZ, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, OFFICER ANTOINE BROWN, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, SHERIFF PETER CORVELLI, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, CAPTAIN NICOLA LOMONTE, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, JOHN U. DOE #7-10 (AS YET UNIDENTIFIED UNION COUNTY OR UNION COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SHERIFF OFFICERS), JOHN H. DOES #1-6 (AS YET UNIDENTIFIED HILLSIDE OFFICERS), POLICE CHIEF VINCENT RICCIARDI, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, SERGEANT DANIEL WANAT, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, OFFICER NATALIE OGONOWSKI, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, DETECTIVE WILSON, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, OFFICER JOSEPH VETTER, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, UNDERSHERIFF AMILAR COLON, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, OFFICER CARLOS GRASSA, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, TOWNSHIP OF HILLSIDE, UNION COUNTY, THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, OFFICER ANA ISCOA-PALACIOS, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, SGT. DANIEL WANAT, JOHN H. DOES #1-6, DETECTIVE WILSON, THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, DETECTIVE YOUNG, UNION COUNTY, OFFICER ANTOINE BROWN, JOHN U. DOE #7-10, SHERIFF OFFICER O'GRADY, OFFICER CARLOS GRASSA, UNDERSHERIFF AMILAR COLON, SHERIFF PETER CORVELLI, OFFICER NATALIE OGONOWSKI, UNDERSHERIFF DENNIS BURKE, OFFICER KRYSTI JANUSZ, VINCENT RICCIARDI, LT. QIANA BROWN, SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI, OFFICER JOSEPH VETTER, CPT. NICOLA LOMONTE, JOHN DOES #11-12 and OFFICER ANA ISCOA-PALACIOS
Case Number: 2:2020cv07461
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by PETER CORVELLI, AMILAR COLON, DENNIS BURKE, SHERIFF OFFICER O'GRADY, THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, UNION COUNTY, SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/25/2020. (qa, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. DONEGAN on behalf of SHERIFF OFFICER O'GRADY (DONEGAN, WILLIAM)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney WILLIAM T. DONEGAN for DENNIS BURKE,WILLIAM T. DONEGAN for AMILAR COLON,WILLIAM T. DONEGAN for PETER CORVELLI,WILLIAM T. DONEGAN for SHERIFF OFFICER O'GRADY,WILLIAM T. DONEGAN for SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI,WILLIAM T. DONEGAN for THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT,WILLIAM T. DONEGAN for UNION COUNTY added. (DONEGAN, WILLIAM)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NYISHA LASSITER COVINGTON. TOWNSHIP OF HILLSIDE served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; QIANA BROWN served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; ANTOINE BROWN served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; DENNIS BURKE served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; AMILAR COLON served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; PETER CORVELLI served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; DETECTIVE WILSON served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; DETECTIVE YOUNG served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; CARLOS GRASSA served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; ANA ISCOA-PALACIOS served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; KRYSTI JANUSZ served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; NICOLA LOMONTE served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; NATALIE OGONOWSKI served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; VINCENT RICCIARDI served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; SHERIFF OFFICER O'GRADY served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; UNION COUNTY served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; JOSEPH VETTER served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; DANIEL WANAT served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (STANGLER, SHELLEY)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TOWNSHIP OF HILLSIDE, QIANA BROWN, ANTOINE BROWN, DENNIS BURKE, AMILAR COLON, PETER CORVELLI, DETECTIVE WILSON, DETECTIVE YOUNG, CARLOS GRASSA, ANA ISCOA-PALACIOS, KRYSTI JANUSZ, NICOLA LOMONTE, NATALIE OGONOWSKI, VINCENT RICCIARDI, SHERIFF OFFICER O'GRADY, SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI, THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, UNION COUNTY, JOSEPH VETTER, DANIEL WANAT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
June 19, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: For future filings, please enter any additional Party Information as Party Text . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (qa, )
June 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NIJEE COVINGTON, A MINOR BY HIS GUARDIAN NYISHA LASSITER COVINGTON, NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, AS ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF JERMAINE COVINGTON, NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, INDIVIDUALLY. (STANGLER, SHELLEY)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10963940) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, AS ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF JERMAINE COVINGTON, NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, INDIVIDUALLY, NIJEE COVINGTON, A MINOR BY HIS GUARDIAN NYISHA LASSITER COVINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(STANGLER, SHELLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LASSITER-COVINGTON et al v. TOWNSHIP OF HILLSIDE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERSHERIFF DENNIS BURKE, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #11-12 (AS YET UNIDENTIFIED UNION TOWNSHIP OFFICIALS OR OFFICERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF OFFICER OGRADY, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE YOUNG, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT QIANA BROWN, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER KRYSTI JANUSZ, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ANTOINE BROWN, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF PETER CORVELLI, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN NICOLA LOMONTE, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN U. DOE #7-10 (AS YET UNIDENTIFIED UNION COUNTY OR UNION COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SHERIFF OFFICERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN H. DOES #1-6 (AS YET UNIDENTIFIED HILLSIDE OFFICERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE CHIEF VINCENT RICCIARDI, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT DANIEL WANAT, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER NATALIE OGONOWSKI, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE WILSON, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOSEPH VETTER, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERSHERIFF AMILAR COLON, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CARLOS GRASSA, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF HILLSIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION COUNTY, THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ANA ISCOA-PALACIOS, IN HER OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. DANIEL WANAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN H. DOES #1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: WILLIAM T. DONEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION COUNTY
Represented By: WILLIAM T. DONEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ANTOINE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN U. DOE #7-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF OFFICER O'GRADY
Represented By: WILLIAM T. DONEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER CARLOS GRASSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERSHERIFF AMILAR COLON
Represented By: WILLIAM T. DONEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF PETER CORVELLI
Represented By: WILLIAM T. DONEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER NATALIE OGONOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERSHERIFF DENNIS BURKE
Represented By: WILLIAM T. DONEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER KRYSTI JANUSZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT RICCIARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. QIANA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF OFFICER YASINSKI
Represented By: WILLIAM T. DONEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOSEPH VETTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT. NICOLA LOMONTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #11-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ANA ISCOA-PALACIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, AS ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF JERMAINE COVINGTON
Represented By: SHELLEY LYNN STANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIJEE COVINGTON, A MINOR BY HIS GUARDIAN NYISHA LASSITER COVINGTON
Represented By: SHELLEY LYNN STANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYISHA LASSITER-COVINGTON, INDIVIDUALLY
Represented By: SHELLEY LYNN STANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.C
Represented By: SHELLEY LYNN STANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYISHA LASSITER COVINGTON
Represented By: SHELLEY LYNN STANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?