ALBIGES v. ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC et al
Plaintiff: BENOIT ALBIGES
Defendant: PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, MARK T. BRADLEY, BLAISE COLEMAN and ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv07536
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN and J. ALEXANDER HOOD, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice J. Alexander Hood II to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11066903.) (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy A. Lieberman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11066825.) (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN, ESQ.; granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. ALEXANDER HOOD II, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/2/2020. (dam, )
June 29, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Alexander Hood II. Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Alexander Hood II by BENOIT ALBIGES. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gustavo F. Bruckner, #2 Declaration of J. Alexander Hood II, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - 3rd Dept., #4 Certificate of Good Standing - SDNY, #5 Proposed Order)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
June 26, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BENOIT ALBIGES. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gustavo F. Bruckner, #2 Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - NY 2nd Dept, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - SDNY, #5 Proposed Order)(LIEBERMAN, JEREMY)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK T. BRADLEY, PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, BLAISE COLEMAN, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
June 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BENOIT ALBIGES. (BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK T. BRADLEY, PAUL V. CAMPANELLI, BLAISE COLEMAN, ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10969316) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BENOIT ALBIGES. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(BRUCKNER, GUSTAVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALBIGES v. ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL V. CAMPANELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK T. BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAISE COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENOIT ALBIGES
Represented By: GUSTAVO FABIAN BRUCKNER
Represented By: JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?