HOME REVOLUTION, LLC et al v. JERRICK MEDIA HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EVAN SOHN, HOME REVOLUTION, LLC and JAY GOLDBERG
Defendant: JERRICK MEDIA HOLDINGS, INC. and JEREMY FROMMER
Case Number: 2:2020cv07775
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, JAY GOLDBERG, EVAN SOHN.(WEISBROT, N.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by All Defendants re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Chelsea Pullano dated 8/10/20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Proof of payment, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Proof of Payment, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Proof of payment, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Proof of payment, #6 Exhibit Ex. F Proof of payment, #7 Exhibit Ex. G Proof of payment, #8 Exhibit Ex. H Proof of payment, #9 Exhibit Ex. I Proof of payment, #10 Exhibit Ex. J Proof of payment, #11 Exhibit Ex. K1 Proof of payment, #12 Exhibit Ex. K2 Proof of payment, #13 Exhibit Ex. L Proof of payment, #14 Exhibit Ex. M Payment chart, #15 Exhibit Ex. N Closing Binder - Contracts, #16 Exhibit Ex. O Form 10K, #17 Exhibit Ex. P Form S1A 7.2.20, #18 Exhibit Ex. Q Form S1A 7.21.20, #19 Exhibit Ex. R Screenshots of Weisbrot trolling)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by All Defendants re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Jonathan Uretsky dated 8/13/20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit chart of last 10 years of successful receiver applications, #2 Exhibit Microsoft call Google not real, #3 Exhibit Facebook history, #4 Exhibit Ex. D "Narrative" part of legit business)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support filed by All Defendants re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Chelsea Pullano dated 8/13/20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A 8-K)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Defendants re #24 MOTION to Dismiss (URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/13/2020. (lag, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Motion Hearing held by telephone conferencing on 8/13/2020 re #10 First MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Order to Show Cause filed by HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, JAY GOLDBERG, EVAN SOHN, #14 First MOTION in Support of Jurisdiction filed by HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, JAY GOLDBERG, EVAN SOHN. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #14 First MOTION in Support of Jurisdiction (URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #14 First MOTION in Support of Jurisdiction Supplemental Declaration of Jonathan Uretsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Chart of Complaint v. Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Steve Ballmer quote re Google, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Facebook history, #4 Exhibit Ex. D "Narrative" part of legit business)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #14 First MOTION in Support of Jurisdiction Supplemental Declaration of Chelsea Pullano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A 8-K)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #10 First MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Order to Show Cause (WEISBROT, N.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #10 First MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Order to Show Cause (URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #10 First MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Order to Show Cause Declaration of Jonathan Uretsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit chart of last 10 years of successful receiver applications)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #10 First MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Order to Show Cause Declaration of Chelsea Pullano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B 10.15.19 wire, #3 Exhibit Ex. C 11.18.19 wire, #4 Exhibit Ex. D 12.17.19 wire, #5 Exhibit Ex. E 1.16.20 wire, #6 Exhibit Ex. F 2.13.20 wire, #7 Exhibit Ex. G 3.31.20 wire, #8 Exhibit Ex. H 5.6.20 wire, #9 Exhibit Ex. I 5.18.20 wire, #10 Exhibit Ex. J 6.24.20 wire, #11 Exhibit Ex. K1 - 7.20.20 wire #1, #12 Exhibit Ex. K2 - 7.20.20 wire #2, #13 Exhibit Ex. L 8.3.20 wire, #14 Exhibit Ex. M Summary Chart, #15 Exhibit Ex. N - Contract, #16 Exhibit Ex. O Form 10K, #17 Exhibit Ex. P 7.2.20 S1A, #18 Exhibit Ex. Q 7.21.20 S1A, #19 Exhibit Weisbrot ethical violations and market manipulation)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
August 10, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #14 First MOTION in Support of Jurisdiction. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION in Support of Jurisdiction by All Plaintiffs. (WEISBROT, N.)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Defendants shall submit their opposition by 8/10/2020; that Plaintiffs shall submit their reply by 8/12/2020; that the court will hold a hearing on 8/13/2020 at 2:00 PM; That plaintiff shall show cause in writing by 8/10/2020, etc., re #10 First MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Order to Show Cause filed by HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, JAY GOLDBERG, EVAN SOHN. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/30/2020. (lag, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status telephone Conference held on 7/30/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs motion for an order to show cause, D.E. 10. The Court will conduct a telephone conference with counsel for the parties today, July 30, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions for the call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/30/2020. (ro, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Order to Show Cause by JAY GOLDBERG, HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, EVAN SOHN. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 Declaration In Support of Order to Show Cause, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WEISBROT, N.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on September 29, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in on the conference call. If counsel are not available for the conference call or have any questions, please email chambers at mf_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/28/20.(LM, )
July 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Status Conference via telephone held on 7/23/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Letter re #6 Letter. (WEISBROT, N.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER- Defendant's request for an extension pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. R. 6 is granted; the time to respond to the Complaint is extended to 7/31/20. There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on July 23, 2020, at 11:15 a.m. to address Defendant's request for an extension of time beyond that provided by Rule 6. All counsel should be present on the line before dialing in to the designated conference number. Once all counsel are on the line, please dial in to (201) 341-3629 to be connected to Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. If counsel are not available for the conference call, please email chambers at mf_orders@njd.uscourts.gov.. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/22/20. (Newman, Robin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Jonathan Uretsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email chain)(URETSKY, JONATHAN)
July 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN C. URETSKY on behalf of JEREMY FROMMER, JERRICK MEDIA HOLDINGS, INC. (URETSKY, JONATHAN)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, JAY GOLDBERG, EVAN SOHN. All Defendants. (WEISBROT, N.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JEREMY FROMMER, JERRICK MEDIA HOLDINGS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
June 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAY GOLDBERG, HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, EVAN SOHN identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WEISBROT, N.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10990444) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HOME REVOLUTION, LLC, JAY GOLDBERG, EVAN SOHN.(WEISBROT, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOME REVOLUTION, LLC et al v. JERRICK MEDIA HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRICK MEDIA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN C. URETSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY FROMMER
Represented By: JONATHAN C. URETSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVAN SOHN
Represented By: N. ARI WEISBROT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOME REVOLUTION, LLC
Represented By: N. ARI WEISBROT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY GOLDBERG
Represented By: N. ARI WEISBROT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?