Sohn et al v. Atria Senior Living Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hee-Kyong Sohn and Jeung Chan Sohn
Defendant: Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc., ATRIA SENIOR LIVING GROUP, INC. and Atria Norwood
Case Number: 2:2020cv08187
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 32 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Thomas A. Bizzaro (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dam, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 31 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
July 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY JONES HOWELL on behalf of ATRIA SENIOR LIVING GROUP, INC., Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc. (HOWELL, KELLY)
July 3, 2020 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 29 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01019. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey (Newark). (ama)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF TRANSFER: WHEREAS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), all parties consent to transfer this matter to the United States District Court of New Jersey (Newark) and stipulate venue is proper in the United States District Court of New Jersey (Newark), it is hereby ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court of New Jersey (Newark). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this matter and transfer the case to the District Court of New Jersey (Newark). (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 7/01/2020) (ama) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. Modified on 7/1/2020 (ama).
June 30, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kelly Jones Howell dated June 30, 2020 re: Transfer of Venue (DKT No. 25). Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Howell, Kelly)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #25 Letter Motion for Conference. Request for a conference is DENIED. Instead, the parties will proceed with briefing. Defendants' motion is due June 30, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition will be due July 14, 2020. Defendants' reply will be due July 21, 2020. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 6/9/2020) (js)
June 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/30/2020. Responses due by 7/14/2020 Replies due by 7/21/2020. (js)
June 1, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Conference to discuss transfer of case addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kelly Jones Howell dated 06/01/2020. Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Howell, Kelly)
June 1, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #9 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Howell, Kelly)
June 1, 2020 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Prometheus Leasehold Parent, LLC, Corporate Parent Atria Fremont Partners, LLC for Atria Senior Living Group, Inc.. Document filed by Atria Senior Living Group, Inc...(Howell, Kelly)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record for the undersigned parties that the time within which Defendants ATRIA SENIOR LIVING GROUP, INC., ATRIA NORWOOD and ATRIA SENIOR LIVING IN NORWOOD, INC. may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including June 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Atria Norwood answer due 6/1/2020; Atria Senior Living Group, Inc. answer due 6/1/2020; Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc. answer due 6/1/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/23/20) (yv)
April 23, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Howell, Kelly)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record for the undersigned parties that the time within which Defendants ATRIA SENIOR LIVING GROUP, INC., ATRIA NORWOOD and ATRIA SENIOR LIVING IN NORWOOD, INC. may move, answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including April 24, 2020. Granted. So Ordered. (Atria Norwood answer due 4/24/2020; Atria Senior Living Group, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020; Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/24/20) (yv)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Howell, Kelly)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record for the undersigned parties that the time within which Defendants ATRIA SENIOR LIVING GROUP, INC., ATRIA NORWOOD ANd ATRIA SENIOR LIVING IN NORWOOD, INC. may move, answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including March 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Atria Norwood answer due 3/27/2020; Atria Senior Living Group, Inc. answer due 3/27/2020; Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc. answer due 3/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/4/20) (yv)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Howell, Kelly)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Howell, Kelly) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 3/4/2020 (km).
March 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kelly Howell to RE-FILE Document #16 Proposed Order. Use the event type Other Filings, Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. (km)
March 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kelly Howell to RE-FILE Document #15 Proposed Order. The title of the document needs to be changed to a proposed stipulation and order. To file the document use the event type Other Filings, Proposed Orders, Proposed Stipulation and Order. (km)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc.. Related Document Number: #3 ..(Howell, Kelly) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 3/2/2020 (km). Modified on 3/2/2020 (km).
February 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Jones Howell on behalf of Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Howell, Kelly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andre J. Major on behalf of Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(Major, Andre)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc. served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service was accepted by LISA PERCOPO - BUSINESS OFFICE DIRECTOR. Document filed by Jeung Chan Sohn; Hee-Kyong Sohn..(Peters, George)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Atria Norwood served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service was accepted by LISA PERCOPO - BUSINESS OFFICE DIRECTOR. Document filed by Jeung Chan Sohn; Hee-Kyong Sohn..(Peters, George)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Atria Senior Living Group, Inc. served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. Service was accepted by LISA GOODLATTE - LEGAL. Document filed by Jeung Chan Sohn; Hee-Kyong Sohn..(Peters, George)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Atria Norwood, Atria Senior Living Group, Inc., Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc.. Document filed by Jeung Chan Sohn, Hee-Kyong Sohn..(Peters, George)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc...(pne)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atria Senior Living Group, Inc...(pne)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atria Norwood..(pne)
February 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
February 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Andrew Bizzaro. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:3601; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Andrew Bizzaro to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATRIA SENIOR LIVING IN NORWOOD, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hee-Kyong Sohn, Jeung Chan Sohn..(Bizzaro, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATRIA NORWOOD, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hee-Kyong Sohn, Jeung Chan Sohn..(Bizzaro, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ATRIA SENIOR LIVING GROUP, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hee-Kyong Sohn, Jeung Chan Sohn..(Bizzaro, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bizzaro, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Jeung Chan Sohn, Hee-Kyong Sohn. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18703127)Document filed by Jeung Chan Sohn, Hee-Kyong Sohn..(Bizzaro, Thomas) Modified on 2/6/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sohn et al v. Atria Senior Living Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hee-Kyong Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeung Chan Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atria Senior Living in Norwood, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Jones
Represented By: ANDRE J. MAJOR
Represented By: KELLY JONES HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATRIA SENIOR LIVING GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Jones
Represented By: ANDRE J. MAJOR
Represented By: KELLY JONES HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atria Norwood
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Jones
Represented By: ANDRE J. MAJOR
Represented By: KELLY JONES HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?