CANAS et al v. STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AT HI-BEAMS GO GO et al
Plaintiff: PAOLA CANAS, CORA SKINNER, JOANNA KRUPA, RACHEL KOREN, JESSA HINTON, BRENDA GEIGER, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, MARIANA DAVALOS, JESSICA KILLINGS and TIFFANY TOTH GRAY
Defendant: JWM, LLC D/B/A HI BEAMS, HI-BEAMS GO GO, JWM, LLC doing business as HI BEAMS and STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AT HI-BEAMS GO GO
Case Number: 2:2020cv08549
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The attached Civil Cover (JS 44) indicates that the origin of this case is a Reinstated/Reopened case, and that option was chosen when opening the case. Please be advised that the only Origin Codes that should be used when opening a new case are: 1- Original Proceeding, 2 - Notice of Removal or 8 - Directly Filed MDL. Please refrain from using any other Origin Codes when opening your cases. (mfr)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on September 16, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/10/2020. (as, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(SIEGEL, ERIC)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JESSA HINTON, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, MARIANA DAVALOS, RACHEL KOREN, PAOLA CANAS, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, CIELO JEAN GIBSON. JWM, LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AT HI-BEAMS GO GO waiver sent on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet) (jc, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JWM, LLC, STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AT HI-BEAMS GO GO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
July 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HI-BEAMS GO GO, JWM, LLC D/B/A HI BEAMS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11052880) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JESSA HINTON, KATARINA VAN DERHAM, TIFFANY TOTH GRAY, JESSICA KILLINGS, JOANNA KRUPA, MARIANA DAVALOS, RACHEL KOREN, PAOLA CANAS, BRENDA GEIGER, CORA SKINNER, CIELO JEAN GIBSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANAS et al v. STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AT HI-BEAMS GO GO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAOLA CANAS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORA SKINNER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNA KRUPA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL KOREN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSA HINTON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GEIGER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIELO JEAN GIBSON
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATARINA VAN DERHAM
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANA DAVALOS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA KILLINGS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY TOTH GRAY
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWM, LLC D/B/A HI BEAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-BEAMS GO GO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWM, LLC doing business as HI BEAMS
Represented By: ERIC GREGORY SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRIP CLUB OWNERS DOING BUSINESS AT HI-BEAMS GO GO
Represented By: ERIC GREGORY SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?