BURCIAGA et al v. 202 RESTAURANT, LLC
Plaintiff: JENNIFER BURCIAGA, TARA LEIGH PATRICK, ROSIE JONES, BRENDA GEIGER, PAOLA CANAS and ALANA SOUZA
Defendant: 202 RESTAURANT, LLC D/B/A WET GENTLEMEN'S CLUB and 202 RESTAURANT, LLC doing business as WET GENTLEMEN'S CLUB
Case Number: 2:2020cv08555
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by 202 RESTAURANT, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/8/2020. (lag, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to 202 Restaurant, LLC.. (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE MARIA DEGEORGIO on behalf of 202 RESTAURANT, LLC (DEGEORGIO, DANIELLE)
August 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The attached Civil Cover (JS 44) indicates that the origin of this case is a Reinstated/Reopened case, and those options were chosen when opening the case. Please be advised that the only Origin Codes that should be used when opening a new case are: 1- Original Proceeding, 2 - Notice of Removal or 8 - Directly Filed MDL. Please refrain from using any other Origin Codes when opening your cases. (mfr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TARA LEIGH PATRICK, BRENDA GEIGER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, PAOLA CANAS, ALANA SOUZA, ROSIE JONES. 202 RESTAURANT, LLC served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lag, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 202 RESTAURANT, LLC D/B/A WET GENTLEMEN'S CLUB. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
July 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 202 RESTAURANT, LLC D/B/A WET GENTLEMEN'S CLUB ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11053178) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TARA LEIGH PATRICK, BRENDA GEIGER, JENNIFER BURCIAGA, PAOLA CANAS, ALANA SOUZA, ROSIE JONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURCIAGA et al v. 202 RESTAURANT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER BURCIAGA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA LEIGH PATRICK
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSIE JONES
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GEIGER
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAOLA CANAS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA SOUZA
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 202 RESTAURANT, LLC D/B/A WET GENTLEMEN'S CLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 202 RESTAURANT, LLC doing business as WET GENTLEMEN'S CLUB
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIA DEGEORGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?