CBRE, INC. v. THE CHAD SCHOOL FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: CBRE, INC.
Defendant: THE CHAD SCHOOL FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2020cv09024
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Chad School Foundation (Defendant) on August 25, 2020, filed by CBRE, INC.. (HABERMAN, PAUL)
August 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANDREW S. BUZIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Counsel Andrew Buzin to Receive Electronic Notifications from the Court for by CBRE, INC.. (HABERMAN, PAUL)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew S. Buzin, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 8/6/2020. (ams, )
July 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Andrew S. Buzin, Esq.. Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE CHAD SCHOOL FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Andrew S. Buzin, Esq. by CBRE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Affirmation in Support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew S. Buzin, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HABERMAN, PAUL)
July 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by CBRE, INC. as to THE CHAD SCHOOL FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED. (HABERMAN, PAUL)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE CHAD SCHOOL FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11086712) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CBRE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(HABERMAN, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CBRE, INC. v. THE CHAD SCHOOL FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHAD SCHOOL FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBRE, INC.
Represented By: PAUL STUART HABERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?