JONES et al v. HOME DEPOT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EILEEN JONES and RONALD JONES
Defendant: HOME DEPOT, INC., ABC LEGAL ENTITIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS LEGAL ENTITIES), JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS), JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC LEGAL ENTITIES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2020cv09051
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by HOME DEPOT, INC..(GIACOPELLI, MICHAEL)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9/17/2020 at 11:00 am before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. At the allotted time, counsel are to dial (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/1/2020. (kd)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C, if circumstances permit, before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/22/2020. (kd)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HOME DEPOT, INC..(GIACOPELLI, MICHAEL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CARLA THOMASINA ELIAS NAVA on behalf of HOME DEPOT, INC. (ELIAS NAVA, CARLA)
July 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT, INC. identifying The Home Depot, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GIACOPELLI, MICHAEL)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT, INC. from Superior Court, Morris County, case number MRS-L-001237-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11090460), filed by HOME DEPOT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proof Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Counsel Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(GIACOPELLI, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES et al v. HOME DEPOT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL N. GIACOPELLI
Represented By: CARLA THOMASINA ELIAS NAVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LEGAL ENTITIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS LEGAL ENTITIES)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LEGAL ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN JONES
Represented By: CARL MAZZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD JONES
Represented By: CARL MAZZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?