BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC. et al. v. I & I HAIR CORPORATION
Plaintiff: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC., BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC. doing business as JANET COLLECTION and HAIR PLUS TRADING CO., INC. doing business as FEMI COLLECTION
Defendant: HAIR PLUS TRADING CO., INC. and I & I HAIR CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv09268
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court will convert the September 29,2020 R. 16 conference to a telephone status conference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/1/20. (tjg, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from I&I Hair Corporation. (BENTLEY, LISA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from John H. Choi, Esq. to William T. Walsh, Clerk of Court re #10 MOTION to Dismiss , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (CHOI, JOHN)
August 21, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 9/29/20 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/21/20. (tjg, )
August 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by I & I HAIR CORPORATION. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Opening Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BENTLEY, LISA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I & I HAIR CORPORATION identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (BENTLEY, LISA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA D. BENTLEY on behalf of I & I HAIR CORPORATION (BENTLEY, LISA)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to I & I HAIR CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corrected AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ld, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ld, )
July 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Exhibit 5 by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC.. (CHOI, JOHN)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC.. (CHOI, JOHN)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC.. (CHOI, JOHN)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I & I HAIR CORPORATION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11107753) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC., HAIR PLUS TRADING CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(CHOI, JOHN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC. et al. v. I & I HAIR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC.
Represented By: JOHN HOON CHOI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAUTY PLUS TRADING CO. INC. doing business as JANET COLLECTION
Represented By: JOHN HOON CHOI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAIR PLUS TRADING CO., INC. doing business as FEMI COLLECTION
Represented By: JOHN HOON CHOI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAIR PLUS TRADING CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I & I HAIR CORPORATION
Represented By: LISA D. BENTLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?