Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, et al. v. Atlas Leasing Inc. et al
Petitioner: DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP and Antonio Pozos
Respondent: TGWC Associates LLC, OMI Florida LLC, Jacob Bengio, 931121 North Shore LLC, NORMAN GINSPARG, PAJ Health Partners LLC, Atlas Leasing Inc., SRCC Associates LLC, SOWC Associates LLC and Mahair Investments, LLC
Intervenor: Eden Gardens LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv09528
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 53 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:19-cv-61261. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Unopposed Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (PMH)
July 26, 2020 Filing 51 Consent MOTION to Transfer re #48 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Non-Party BRPA by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Consent to Transfer Motion to Compel)(Chatham, Asra)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick M. Hunt for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jc) Modified Judge Assignment on 7/24/2020 (jc).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for all further proceedings. Motions referred to Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Non-Party BRPA by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. Attorney Robert Michael Kline added to party Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP(pty:mov), Attorney Robert Michael Kline added to party Antonio Pozos(pty:mov). Responses due by 8/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Probable Cause for Lasko Arrest Warrant, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3 - July 21 2020 Email from BRPA)(Kline, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Non-Party Subpoenas by Norman Ginsparg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shapiro, Lyle)
July 23, 2020 Filing 46 OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO ENFORCE NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS by PAJ Health Partners LLC, SOWC Associates LLC, SRCC Associates LLC, TGWC Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Cohen, Darci)
July 23, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sari E. Kolatch. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13231083 by PAJ Health Partners LLC, SOWC Associates LLC, SRCC Associates LLC, TGWC Associates LLC. Responses due by 8/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Darci)
July 23, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth J. Rubinstein. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13231053 by TGWC Associates LLC, SOWC Associates LLC, PAJ Health Partners LLC, SRCC Associates LLC. Attorney Darci Erin Cohen added to party TGWC Associates LLC(pty:res), Attorney Darci Erin Cohen added to party SOWC Associates LLC(pty:res), Attorney Darci Erin Cohen added to party PAJ Health Partners LLC(pty:res), Attorney Darci Erin Cohen added to party SRCC Associates LLC(pty:res). Responses due by 8/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Darci)
July 14, 2020 Filing 43 Renewed MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena for Documents by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. Responses due by 7/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lasko Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - DE 128 Order re Discovery Dispute, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Marathon Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Sparta Transcript, #7 Exhibit 7 - Blazar Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 3 2020 Email from Curits to Chapman, #9 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Service with Subpoena, #10 Exhibit 10 - June 9 2020 Email, #11 Exhibit 11 - June 22 2020 Email from Chatham to Chapman, #12 Exhibit 12 - HK Response to Subpoena, #13 Exhibit 13 - Emails between MWE and HK, #14 Exhibit 14 - Email from Hole on July 10 2020, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2d Email from Hole on July 10 2020, #16 Exhibit 16 - Email from Curtis to Hole)(Curtis, Oliver)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #41 Movant's Motion to Compel for failing to attach a certificate of service to the party against whom the Motion is directed and all parties in this case. Movant shall refile the Motion with the appropriate certificate of service. Movant also suggests that it seeks an expedited ruling on its Motion but does not properly request same. If Movant seeks an expedited ruling, Movant shall file a separate Motion for Expedited Consideration and indicate when a response and reply is requested and when it seeks the Court to address its Motion. Prior to making this request, Movant shall confer with non-party Holland and Knight to inquire whether expedited dates can be agreed to for completion of briefing to the Court. If the parties are unable to agree to a briefing schedule, the undersigned will set one unilaterally. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/13/2020. (sl00)
July 13, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena for Documents by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. Responses due by 7/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lasko Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - DE 128 Order re Discovery Dispute, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Marathon Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer, #6 Exhibit 6 - Sparta Transcript, #7 Exhibit 7 - Blazar Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 3 2020 Email from Curits to Chapman, #9 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Service with Subpoena, #10 Exhibit 10 - June 9 2020 Email, #11 Exhibit 11 - June 22 2020 Email from Chatham to Chapman, #12 Exhibit 12 - HK Response to Subpoena, #13 Exhibit 13 - Emails between MWE and HK, #14 Exhibit 14 - Email from Hole on July 10 2020, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2d Email from Hole on July 10 2020, #16 Exhibit 16 - Email from Curtis to Hole)(Curtis, Oliver)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #38 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Movants' Petition to Enforce Non-Party Subpoenas, ECF No. 35, up to and including July 23, 2020; granting #38 the Respondents' Motion for Leave to File Separate Responses. Therefore, Norman Ginsparg and "the Entities" shall be allowed to file separate Responses to the Motion at ECF No. 35, not to exceed 10 pages each. After the Responses are filed, but before July 27 at noon, the parties shall schedule one hour to meaningfully confer by telephone or video-conference to determine if they can resolve some or all of the issues presented. If the parties resolve the issues before the Court, they shall file a Notice of Withdrawal of Movants' Petition on or before noon on July 28, 2020. If they fail to resolve all of the issues, they shall file a status report regarding the conferral as to any remaining issues by July 28, 2020. A single Reply to the two Responses shall be filed on or before July 31, 2020, not to exceed ten pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/7/2020. (sl00)
July 7, 2020 Filing 39 Clerks Notice to Filer re #38 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Enforce and for Permission to File Separate Responses re 37 Order,,,. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 38 Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #35 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Non-Party Subpoenas by Norman Ginsparg. Responses due by 7/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Lyle) Modified Relief on 7/7/2020 (ls). Added MOTION for Leave to File Separate Responses on 7/7/2020 (ls).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED BRIEFING on Movants' Petition to Enforce Non-Party Subpoenas, ECF No. 35. TGWC Associates LLC (TGWC), SRCC Associates LLC (SRCC), SOWC Associates LLC (SOWC), PAJ Health Partners, LLC (PAJ), Norman Ginsparg, and Mahair Investments LLC (Mahair), including any other non-parties referenced within the Petition from whom discovery is sought, (collectively, Respondents), shall file a Joint Response to Movants' Petition on or before July 10, 2020. Leave of Court to file a separate response may be requested upon good cause no later than July 8, 2020, but any response shall be filed by July 10, 2020. Movants' Reply shall be filed on or before July 15, 2020. Movants shall provide a copy of Movants' Petition and this Order to all non-parties (Respondents) from whom discovery is sought no later than July 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/6/2020. (sl00)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #35 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/6/2020. (mws)
June 30, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Non-Party Subpoenas by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Responses due by 7/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Curtis, Oliver)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. In light of Judge Snows #33 Order on the #1 Petition to Enforce Subpoena, and the matters presently before the Court having been resolved, this case is considered CLOSED. Should future disputes arise regarding non-party discovery as the underlying New Jersey lawsuit progresses, these issues may be raised in a manner authorized by the federal rules at the appropriate time. No status report shall be required. The Clerk is directed to mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/18/2019. (mws)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #30 Motion for Hearing; denying #31 Motion ; granting in part re #32 Motion to Stay; denying as moot #26 Motion to Intervene ; denying as moot #26 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 19, 2019 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Stay re #31 MOTION Motion for Court Order Authorizing the Disclosure of Government Agency Records Movants' Motion for Court Order Authorizing the Disclosure of Government Agency Records, #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Norman Ginsparg. Responses due by 10/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Lyle)
September 11, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION Motion for Court Order Authorizing the Disclosure of Government Agency Records Movants' Motion for Court Order Authorizing the Disclosure of Government Agency Records by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Curtis, Oliver)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Movants' Request for Hearing and Expedited Ruling on Petition to Enforce Out-of-State Subpoenas by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Curtis, Oliver)
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to #28 Response/Reply (Other), #26 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoena Request by Eden Gardens LLC. (Rasco, Guy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Quash Subpoena Request Movants' Response in Opposition to Eden Gardens, LLC's Motion to Intervene by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Composite Exhibit 1), #2 Exhibit (Composite Exhibit 2), #3 Exhibit (Exhibit 3))(Curtis, Oliver)
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, (Movants' Reply in Support of Petition to Enforce Subpoena to OMI Florida, Inc.) by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018 OMI Filing, #2 Exhibit 2 - June 28 Email from Andrews, #3 Exhibit 3 - June 28 Email from Chatham, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 28 Email from Curtis, #5 Exhibit 5 - July 22 Email from Curtis, #6 Exhibit 6-1 OMI Articles of Org (Composite), #7 Exhibit 6-2 JNL Articles of Org (Composite), #8 Exhibit 6-3 SRCC Articles of Org (Composite), #9 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiffs Responses to RFAs, #10 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of Lasko Depo)(Curtis, Oliver)
July 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Quash Subpoena Request by Eden Gardens LLC. Attorney Guy Austin Rasco added to party Eden Gardens LLC(pty:intv). (Rasco, Guy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by OMI Florida LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit A)(Rasco, Guy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Movants' Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Respondent Jacob Bengio from Petition to Enforce Subpoenas (Curtis, Oliver)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/2/2019. (bj00)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by OMI Florida LLC. Attorney Guy Austin Rasco added to party OMI Florida LLC(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rasco, Guy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, #19 Response/Reply (Other) Movants' Reply in Support of Petition to Enforce Subpoena to Norman Ginsparg by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Curtis, Oliver)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos re #3 Affidavit,,,,,,,, #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed U.S. Registered Mail Return Receipt) (Curtis, Oliver)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Norman Ginsparg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Shapiro, Lyle)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/21/2019. (bj00)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Extend Respondent Jacob Bengio's Deadline to Respond to Movants' Petition to Enforce Third-Party Subpoenas by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Oliver)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/14/2019. (bj00)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Norman Ginsparg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Lyle)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/13/2019. (bj00)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Enforce Non Party Subpoenas re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Jacob Bengio. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burger, Alan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to #7 Response to Motion, Movants' Reply in Support of Petition to Enforce Subpoena to Atlas Leasing, Inc. by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit D)(Curtis, Oliver)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/7/2019. (bj00)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Norman Ginsparg. Attorney Lyle Eric Shapiro added to party Norman Ginsparg(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Lyle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District. (Summonses Not Issued by Clerk) SEE DE #8 Image (ail)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Notice of Filing Affidavits of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service)) (Curtis, Oliver)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time 2 weeks re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, filed by Atlas Leasing Inc.. Attorney Bruce David Green added to party Atlas Leasing Inc.(pty:res). Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Green, Bruce)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/30/2019. (bj00)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time 2 weeks re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Jacob Bengio. Attorney Alan Michael Burger added to party Jacob Bengio(pty:res). Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion Ext. of Time)(Burger, Alan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Movants' Petition to Enforce Non-Party Subpoenas.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)Document Replaced on 5/23/2019 (ail).
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Lance J. Kalik, Esq.. re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Declaration of Lance J. Kalik, Esq. in Support of the Drinker Movants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas Issued from the District of New Jersey Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exh. A - Complaint), #2 Exhibit (Exh. B - Marathon Report), #3 Exhibit (Exh. C - DBR Answer Doc. No. 17), #4 Exhibit (Exh. D - Notice of Subpoenas), #5 Exhibit (Exh. E - Letter to Kalik 00382567 objecting to subpoenas), #6 Exhibit (Exh. F - Email from Kalik 3.26.2019), #7 Exhibit (Exh. G - Mahair Investments LLC - 2019-02-26 13.40.10), #8 Exhibit (Exh. H - Atlas Leasing, Inc. 2019-02-26 13.41.31), #9 Exhibit (Exh. I - Norman Ginsparg - 2019-02-26 13.33.54), #10 Exhibit (Exh. J - Jacob Bengio - 2019-02-26 13.30.41), #11 Exhibit (Exh. K - OMI Florida LLC - 2019-02-26 13.46.36), #12 Exhibit (Exh. L - 931121 North Shore LLC - 2019-02-26 13.47.55), #13 Exhibit (Exh. M - Joint Letter filed in Underlying Action), #14 Exhibit (Exh. N - Bengio Ginsparg - Letter 3-25-19), #15 Exhibit (Exh. O - Riker response to Ginsparg-Bengio), #16 Exhibit (Exh. P - Ginsparg objection letter), #17 Exhibit (Exh. Q - Bengo Objection Letter), #18 Exhibit (Exh. R - Third Superseding Indictment), #19 Exhibit (Exh. S - Verdict Sheet), #20 Exhibit (Exh. T - Petron1), #21 Exhibit (Exh. U - Petron2), #22 Exhibit (Exh. V - Mahair Check), #23 Exhibit (Exh. W - JNL Management - Org Docs), #24 Exhibit (Exh. X - TGWC Corporate Documents), #25 Exhibit (Exh. Y - Detention Transcript Part 2), #26 Exhibit (Exh. Z - Law360 Article regarding Nelson Salazar testimony), #27 Exhibit (Exh. AA - Crime Scene sign-in-log), #28 Exhibit (Exh. BB - Government's Notice of 404 (b), #29 Exhibit (Exh. CC - California Complaint), #30 Exhibit (Exh. DD - Plaintiffs' responses to DBR-Pozos 1st set of interrogatories - 00385076))(Curtis, Oliver)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Movants' Petition to Enforce Non-Party Subpoenas. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-11657279, filed by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curtis, Oliver)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, et al. v. Atlas Leasing Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TGWC Associates LLC
Represented By: Sari E. Kolatch
Represented By: Darci Erin Cohen
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: OMI Florida LLC
Represented By: Guy Austin Rasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jacob Bengio
Represented By: Alan Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 931121 North Shore LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NORMAN GINSPARG
Represented By: Lyle Eric Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PAJ Health Partners LLC
Represented By: Sari E. Kolatch
Represented By: Darci Erin Cohen
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Atlas Leasing Inc.
Represented By: Bruce David Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SRCC Associates LLC
Represented By: Sari E. Kolatch
Represented By: Darci Erin Cohen
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SOWC Associates LLC
Represented By: Sari E. Kolatch
Represented By: Darci Erin Cohen
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mahair Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Eden Gardens LLC
Represented By: Guy Austin Rasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP
Represented By: Robert Michael Kline
Represented By: Oliver Benton Curtis, III
Represented By: Asra Annette Chatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Pozos
Represented By: Robert Michael Kline
Represented By: Oliver Benton Curtis, III
Represented By: Asra Annette Chatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?