AZIZ et al v. CITY OF NEWARK
Plaintiff: RUDAN RAMSAHAI, RONNIE CRUZ and MALIKUL AZIZ
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK
Case Number: 2:2020cv10309
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Ronald B. Finley (SLATER, ADAM)
October 8, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Hector Ortiz (SLATER, ADAM)
October 8, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Jilil Wilkins (SLATER, ADAM)
October 8, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Thiago R. Marques (SLATER, ADAM)
October 8, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Derek De La Cruz (SLATER, ADAM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Robby Rios (SLATER, ADAM)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Luke, Jr., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/5/20. (jc, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Johnathan E. Castro (SLATER, ADAM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Ruben Baez (SLATER, ADAM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Joshua A. Paul (SLATER, ADAM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Jorge L. Rodriguez (SLATER, ADAM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Brian Terrell Garlic (SLATER, ADAM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Christopher Perez (SLATER, ADAM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Brandon Gonzalez (SLATER, ADAM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Tyler J. Gonzalez (SLATER, ADAM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Shamira Rollins (SLATER, ADAM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Michael Hiel (SLATER, ADAM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Aquil Young (SLATER, ADAM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Steve Pereira (SLATER, ADAM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Joshua Velez (SLATER, ADAM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Clinton Bloomfield (SLATER, ADAM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Kyri A. Kemp (SLATER, ADAM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Johnny B. Rivera (SLATER, ADAM)
September 30, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Dennis A. Ceron (SLATER, ADAM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Lorenzo J. Orsi (SLATER, ADAM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Angel Concepcion (SLATER, ADAM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Sharon Kamal (SLATER, ADAM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Rashid Sabur (SLATER, ADAM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Paul Orbe (SLATER, ADAM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Luis Steven Gallegos Veliz (SLATER, ADAM)
September 17, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Breiana Simmons (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Consent to Sue Justin C. Corio (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Consent to Sue Tigee Pagan (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Krystal Rosario (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue James Robert Juhrden (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Joseph R. Kelly (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Jason Thomas (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Oscar Y Acevedo (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Mario (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Rosanna Garcia (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Nicholas A. Edert (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Andre C. Dozier Dozier (SLATER, ADAM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time that Defendant may serve and file a responsive pleading to October 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/16/20. (jc, )
September 16, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Update - The #28 Stipulation submitted by the parties has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/14/2020. (jc, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by CHEYNE ROBRE SCOTT on behalf of CITY OF NEWARK (SCOTT, CHEYNE)
September 15, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION & ORDER EXTENDING TIME by CITY OF NEWARK. (SCOTT, CHEYNE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Edwin Guzman (SLATER, ADAM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Vincent Angelone (SLATER, ADAM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Ryan Castro (SLATER, ADAM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Jude Ted Cheron (SLATER, ADAM)
September 1, 2020 Filing 23 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MALIKUL AZIZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam P. Slater in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission of John C. Luke, Jr., #2 Certification In Support of Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Terrell Grace (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Steven Acebedo (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Steven Abreu (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Nicholas Diaz (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Ibn Shaquon Grant (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Gianna Cuffari (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Giancarlo Zazzara (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Dariel J. Bernal (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Connor Patrick Petersen (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Christopher W Donker (SLATER, ADAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Christopher Gomez (SLATER, ADAM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Daniel Silva (SLATER, ADAM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Kennedy J. Murray, Jr. (SLATER, ADAM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Notice of Consent to Sue Alicia Lauderdale (SLATER, ADAM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MALIKUL AZIZ. CITY OF NEWARK served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (SLATER, ADAM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ Ronald Holmes Consent to Sue FLSA (SLATER, ADAM)
August 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by RUDAN RAMSAHAI Consent to Sue FLSA (SLATER, ADAM)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by MALIKUL AZIZ re #1 Complaint Notice of Consent to Sue (SLATER, ADAM)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITY OF NEWARK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Ronnie Cruz re #1 Complaint Consent to Sue (SLATER, ADAM)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (SLATER, ADAM)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEWARK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11193434) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Malikul Aziz.(SLATER, ADAM)
August 11, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (ps, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AZIZ et al v. CITY OF NEWARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDAN RAMSAHAI
Represented By: ADAM SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE CRUZ
Represented By: ADAM SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIKUL AZIZ
Represented By: ADAM SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEWARK
Represented By: CHEYNE ROBRE SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?