CHURCH v. MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD J. CHURCH
Defendant: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10 and MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10538
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-10, MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, filed by CLIFFORD J. CHURCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(KIM, YONGMOON)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Compel Arbitration . (KIM, YONGMOON)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on November 12, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/23/2020. (as, )
September 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Compel Arbitration. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Compel Arbitration by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Affidavit Certification Thomas M. Brodowski, Esq., #4 Affidavit Certification of Olimatta Strickland, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Adam Swaninger)(BRODOWSKI, THOMAS)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHRWISERESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that Defendants' time to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to September 18, 2020, with a new return date of October 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/10/2020. (ld, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time for by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC. (BRODOWSKI, THOMAS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. TRAINOR on behalf of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC (TRAINOR, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/4/2020. (ld, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Attorney THOMAS MICHAEL BRODOWSKI, JR for MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.,THOMAS MICHAEL BRODOWSKI, JR for MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC added. (BRODOWSKI, THOMAS)
August 14, 2020 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number L-3864-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11210891), filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(BRODOWSKI, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHURCH v. MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: THOMAS MICHAEL BRODOWSKI, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS MICHAEL BRODOWSKI, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD J. CHURCH
Represented By: YONGMOON KIM
Represented By: RONALD IRA LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?