SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP et al v. RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., SM MEDICAL LLC, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLC and SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP
Defendant: OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, LLP, JOHN DOES 1-20, UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC. and JOHNS DOE 1-20
Case Number: 2:2020cv10539
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Joseph A Dickson
2 Judge: Kevin McNulty
3 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Clerk is in receipt of the #20 Application for Automatic Clerk's Extension pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(5) as to the pending #19 Motion to Dismiss. Extensions under this rule are automatic in nature and do not require any action by the Clerk unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only and will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (jc, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney LAUREN TOPELSOHN for SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TOPELSOHN, LAUREN)
September 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Compel Arbitration and Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Compel Arbitration and Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michele Nielsen, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(PENARO, STEVEN)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Substituting Riverside Medical Management, LLC in Place of Riverside Medical Group, LLC in the Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/17/20. (jc, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 Letter re #1 Notice of Removal,,, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Compel Arbitration and Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #16 Affidavit of Service, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Substitute Defendant & Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss)(TOPELSOHN, LAUREN)
August 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Compel Arbitration and Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Riverside Medical Management LLC on 8/24/2020, filed by SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., SM MEDICAL LLC. (TOPELSOHN, LAUREN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Compel Arbitration and Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michele Nielson, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(PENARO, STEVEN)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY re #10 Amended Document, of Errata regarding Amended Notice of Removal and Declaration Supporting Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Corrected Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A) to Ex. 1, State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B) to Ex. 1, 2019 Federal Complaint, #4 Exhibit C) to Ex. 1, Corrected Declaration in Support, #5 Exhibit D) to Ex. 1, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(PENARO, STEVEN)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN TOPELSOHN on behalf of SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., SM MEDICAL LLC (TOPELSOHN, LAUREN)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN I ADLER on behalf of SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., SM MEDICAL LLC (ADLER, STEVEN)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY re #10 Amended Document, Notice of Consent to Amended Notice of Removal (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B) 2019 Federal Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C) Nielsen Declaration in Support, #4 Exhibit D) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(PENARO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal,,, /Notice of Consent to Removal (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 17, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, Jury Demand, Nature of Suit, Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez, Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/17/20. (ak, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,,, Revised Civil Cover Sheet by OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPTUM, INC.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 14, 2020 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (ps, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPTUM CARE, INC.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OPTUM, INC., OPTUM CARE, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., JOHN DOES 1-20, UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC. from Superior Court of Essex County NJ, case number ESX L 004846 20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11210989), filed by OPTUM, INC., OPTUM CARE, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, LLP, JOHN DOES 1-20, UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PENARO, STEVEN) Modified on 8/17/2020 (jc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP et al v. RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM CARE, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, LLP
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSIDE MEDICAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNS DOE 1-20
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC.
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?