INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. BECERRA et al
Plaintiff: INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA, MELISSA RAE KING and DREW BOHAN
Case Number: 2:2020cv10566
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Russel B. Hildreth: $ 150, receipt number TRE114027 (mg)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER Preserving Defendants' Jurisdictional Arguments; The matter of Interlink v. Becerra et al., Case No. 2:20-cv-10566 is consolidated into Case No. 2:20-cv-7654 for all purposes, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/8/2020. (ams, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT ORDER preserving Defendants' Jurisdictional Arguments re #17 Stipulation. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/8/2020. (dam, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D. MARINO on behalf of Defendants XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, and MELISSA RAE KING (MARINO, MARK) Modified on 9/8/2020 (dam).
September 8, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per #21 Order. (ams, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa Rae King in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, #2 Certification of Counsel in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction)(MARINO, MARK)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER PRESERVING DEFENDANTS JURISDICTIONAL ARGUMENTS by All Defendants. (WELLINGHORST, STEPHEN)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: In view of Mr. Lattimore's August 28, 2020 letter [D.E. 13], the parties are not required to file a discovery confidentiality order at this time.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/2/2020. (Hammer, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of RUSSELL B. HILDRETH, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/1/2020. (dam, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Certification of Stephen Wellinghorst, Esq. in Support of Application of Admission of Russell B. Hildreth, Esq. Pro Hac Vice on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Admitting Russell B. Hildreth, Esq. Pro Hac Vice)(MARINO, MARK)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #10 Scheduling Order. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Certification Certification in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(MARINO, MARK)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D. MARINO on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING (MARINO, MARK)
August 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
August 26, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/26/2020. (ECR) (jqb, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that on or before 9/4/2020, Plaintiff shall produce to Defendants all communications between Plaintiff and Home Depot and/or Amazon. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/26/2020. (dam, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone conference with the Undersigned today, August 26, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss expedited discovery in this matter. Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and dial 1456817# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/26/2020. (MAH)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants shall submit papers in response to Interlinks Motion on or before September 4, 2020; no reply is authorized; counsel for the parties shall contact Hon. Michael A. Hammer, United States Magistrate Judge, by August 26, 2020, for the purpose of a telephone conference to discuss any expedited discovery that may be required; a telephone conference is scheduled on September 11, 2020, at 2:00 pm to discuss administrative and logistic issues in connection with the hearing; the hearing on Interlinks Motion is scheduled on September 16, 2020, at 11:00 am via video conference. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/21/2020. (sm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Certification of Service on behalf of INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Re #6 Certification in Support of Motion, #4 Motion for TRO, #5 Certification in Support of Motion. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction DECLARATION OF JASON B. LATTIMORE (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction DECLARATION OF ELI ZHADANOV (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to XAVIER BECERRA, DREW BOHAN, MELISSA RAE KING. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
August 17, 2020 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11212158), filed by INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LATTIMORE, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. BECERRA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: MARK D. MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA RAE KING
Represented By: MARK D. MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREW BOHAN
Represented By: MARK D. MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERLINK PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: JASON B. LATTIMORE
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?