Umeugo v. Green at Bloomfield
Plaintiff: Jennifer Umeugo
Defendant: Green at Bloomfield and BNE Real Estate Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv10593
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JILL CANTOR-BURNS for Green at Bloomfield added.. (CANTOR-BURNS, JILL)
August 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01392. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 4, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULING granting #18 Motion to Transfer to Another District.The clerk is ordered to transfer this action to the district of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/4/2020. (Bozek, M.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Jennifer Umeugo. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Green at Bloomfield. (Ciollo, Joseph)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 OBJECTION re #18 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Jennifer Umeugo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Dr. Jennifer Umeugo, #3 Exhibit Yale New Haven Hospital Medical Records & Bills, #4 Exhibit Medical Report from Dr. Brad J. Yoo)(Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Green at Bloomfield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ciollo, Joseph)
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #16 Answer to Complaint filed by Jennifer Umeugo. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Green at Bloomfield.(Ciollo, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 RULING on Pending Motions: denying #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/11/2020. (Bozek, M.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) filed by Green at Bloomfield. (Ciollo, Joseph)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) filed by Jennifer Umeugo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Jennifer Umeugo, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Driver's License, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Car Registration)(Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green at Bloomfield. (Ciollo, Joseph)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT A by Green at Bloomfield re #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1). (Ciollo, Joseph)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) by Green at Bloomfield.Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Ciollo, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Green at Bloomfield to 11/15/2019. See 9 Order. (Bozek, M.)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting the defendant's #8 motion for extension of time, absent objection. The time for the defendant to file a response is hereby extended to and including November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/8/2019. (Sondergeld, C.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 15, 2019 To file a responsive pleading by Green at Bloomfield. (Ciollo, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Ciollo on behalf of Green at Bloomfield (Ciollo, Joseph)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Umeugo. Green at Bloomfield served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Green at Bloomfield* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ikechukwu Umeugo* *Umeugo & Assoc.* *620 Boston Post Rd., PO Box 26373* *West Haven, CT 06516*. (Bozek, M.)
September 16, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Jennifer Umeugo, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2019.(Bozek, M.)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/6/2019.(Bozek, M.)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2019. Discovery due by 3/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/6/2019.(Bozek, M.)
September 6, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green at Bloomfield ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5429560.), filed by Jennifer Umeugo.(Umeugo, Ikechukwu) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umeugo v. Green at Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green at Bloomfield
Represented By: JILL CANTOR-BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNE Real Estate Group, LLC
Represented By: JILL CANTOR-BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Umeugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?