Gonzales v. Allergan USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alicia M Gonzales
Defendant: ALLERGAN USA INC.
In Re: IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv10653
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Member Case Transferred in on 8/18/20 from the Eastern District of Louisiana 2:20-02103 for MDL 2921 IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 18, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (gh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02103. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2921. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sbs)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2921. (sbs)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Allergan USA, Inc. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Martin, Richard)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allergan USA, Inc. (sbs)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Request of Summons Issued as to Allergan USA, Inc. filed by Alicia M Gonzales re #1 Complaint. (Martin, Richard)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allergan USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8415909) filed by Alicia M Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Richard Massie Martin, Jr added to party Alicia M Gonzales(pty:pla).(Martin, Richard) Modified text on 7/24/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia M Gonzales
Represented By: Richard Massie Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?