INSELBERG et al v. BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLP et al
Plaintiff: ERIC INSELBERG and INSELBERG INTERACTIVE, LLC
Defendant: CLINTON BROOK & PEED, BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, BRIAN C BROOK, TIMOTHY R CLINTON, CLINTON & PEED, PLLC, CLINTON & PEED, JANE DOES, ESQS., 1-10, JOHN DOES, ESQS., 1-10 and BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLP
Case Number: 2:2020cv10789
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs' Letter Request for an adjournment until November 4, 2020 to file their opposition papers to the pending motions. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/16/20. (jc, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Kenneth S. Thyne, Esq re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (THYNE, KENNETH)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiffs' Letter Request for an extension until October 19, 2020 to file their opposition papers. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/2/20. (jc, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Kenneth S. Thyne, Esq re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (THYNE, KENNETH)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss (THYNE, KENNETH)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss, #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by BRIAN C BROOK, BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLP. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Brian C. Brook, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(BROOK, BRIAN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by TIMOTHY R CLINTON, CLINTON & PEED. Responses due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Timothy R. Clinton, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(KUBLANOVSKY, EUGENE)
August 27, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by CLINTON & PEED, TIMOTHY R CLINTON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/9/2020. (jc, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Amended Complaint. Attorney EUGENE DAVID KUBLANOVSKY for TIMOTHY R CLINTON,EUGENE DAVID KUBLANOVSKY for CLINTON & PEED added. (KUBLANOVSKY, EUGENE)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EUGENE DAVID KUBLANOVSKY on behalf of TIMOTHY R CLINTON, CLINTON & PEED (KUBLANOVSKY, EUGENE)
August 26, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The #2 Application for Local Rule 6.1 Clerk's Extension, incorrectly submitted as a motion by CLINTON BROOK & PEED, BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLP, BRIAN C BROOK, has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/9/2020. (jc, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by BRIAN C BROOK, BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLP, CLINTON BROOK & PEED. (BROOK, BRIAN)
August 20, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption (must match state court case), Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, )
August 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CLINTON BROOK & PEED, Brook & Associates, PLLC, Brian C. Brook from Superior Court of Bergen County, case number BER-L-003659-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11229933), filed by CLINTON BROOK & PEED, Brook & Associates, PLLC, Brian C. Brook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Certification of Brian C. Brook), #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(BROOK, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INSELBERG et al v. BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON BROOK & PEED
Represented By: BRIAN C. BROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLC
Represented By: BRIAN C. BROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN C BROOK
Represented By: BRIAN C. BROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY R CLINTON
Represented By: EUGENE DAVID KUBLANOVSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON & PEED, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON & PEED
Represented By: EUGENE DAVID KUBLANOVSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES, ESQS., 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, ESQS., 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOK & ASSOCIATES, PLLP
Represented By: BRIAN C. BROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC INSELBERG
Represented By: KENNETH S. THYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSELBERG INTERACTIVE, LLC
Represented By: KENNETH S. THYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?